Saleba v. Medpace, Inc.
Plaintiff: Paul Saleba
Defendant: Medpace, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00634
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Shank for Defendant Medpace, Inc. (Shank, Robert)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Medpace, Inc.. (Montgomery, David)
October 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David Kirsten Montgomery for Defendant Medpace, Inc. (Montgomery, David)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Medpace, Inc. on 8/17/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Freking, Randolph)
August 18, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND for Age Discrimination, Collective against Medpace, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7610744), filed by Paul Saleba. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Separation Agreement and General Release, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Freking, Randolph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saleba v. Medpace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Saleba
Represented By: Randolph Harry Freking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medpace, Inc.
Represented By: David Kirsten Montgomery
Represented By: Robert D. Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?