Hicks v. City Of Cincinnati
Plaintiff: Joseph Hicks
Defendant: City Of Cincinnati and The City of Cincinnati
Case Number: 1:2020cv00641
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CALENDAR ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 10/30/2020. Settlement demand due two weeks after issuance of decision by Civil Service Commission. Response to settlement demand due two weeks after demand. Motions to amend pleadings/add parties due by 11/13/2020. Motions related to pleadings due by 12/18/2020. Plaintiff's Experts due by 12/4/2020. Defendant's Experts due by 1/4/2021. Rebuttal Experts due by 2/5/2021. Disclosure of Non-Expert (Fact) Witness due by 2/5/2021. Discovery due by 2/5/2021. Dispositive motions due by 3/5/2021. Final Pretrial July 2021. Jury Trial August 2021. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 10/13/2020. (kaf)
October 13, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Matthew W. McFarland: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 10/13/2020. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant present by phone. Status of case discussed. Status Conference set for 01/11/2021 at 2:30PM via Teleconference before Judge Matthew W. McFarland. Counsel shall refer to 08/24/2020 docket entry for dial-in instructions. Calendar Order to follow. (kaf)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant The City of Cincinnati. (Creditt Mai, Lauren)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Creditt Mai, Lauren)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 7/20/2020 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas by Joseph Hicks against The City of Cincinnati. (eh)
August 20, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A2002560 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7614856), filed by City Of Cincinnati. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Creditt Mai, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. City Of Cincinnati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Hicks
Represented By: Ivan Lawrence Tamarkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Cincinnati
Represented By: Lauren Creditt Mai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Cincinnati
Represented By: Lauren Creditt Mai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?