Jones v. Ohio National Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Rhonda F. Jones
Defendant: Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation and Ohio National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00654
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
August 24, 2020 Judge Douglas R. Cole added. (er)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00356. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 Memorandum Opinion and Order: For reasons set forth in this order, Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue is GRANTED (Doc. No. #9 .) The Court ORDERS this case transferred, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio, and declines to consider the merits of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Entered Judge Pamela A. Barker on 8/19/2020.(L,Ja) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/24/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 Reply in support of #9 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim, Motion to change/transfer venue filed by All Defendants. (Lampone, Kevin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/24/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 Memorandum in Opposition to #9 Motion to dismiss of Plaintiff filed by Rhonda F. Jones. (Patil, Chetan) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/24/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim , Motion to change/transfer venue filed by Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation, Ohio National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Kevin S. Lampone)(Lampone, Kevin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/24/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 Stipulation: Defendants shall have an additional 7 days up to and including April 2, 2020 to move or plead in response to Plaintiffs Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Lampone, Kevin) (L,Ja). Modified on 3/27/2020, to reflect actual filing (L,Ja). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/24/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ohio National Life Insurance Company. (Lampone, Kevin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/24/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation. (Lampone, Kevin) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/24/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 Stipulation Extension of Time to Move or Plead. Defendants shall have an additional 14 days up to and including March 26, 2020, to move or plead in response to Plaintiffs Complaint. filed by All Defendants. (Lampone, Kevin) Modified on 3/13/2020 (L,Ja). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation on 2/20/2020, filed on behalf of Rhonda F. Jones (Patil, Chetan) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Ohio National Life Insurance Company on 2/20/2020, filed on behalf of Rhonda F. Jones (Patil, Chetan) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation, Ohio National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (L,MI) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-9800358.. Filed by Rhonda F. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons ONLIC Summons, #3 Summons ONLAC Summons) (Patil, Chetan) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/24/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Ohio National Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Lampone
Represented By: Scott C. Matasar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin Lampone
Represented By: Scott C. Matasar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda F. Jones
Represented By: Chetan S. Patil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?