Voss v. Quicken Loans LLC et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Voss
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. and Quicken Loans LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00756
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph F. Yenouskas, Brooks R. Broan, Patrice E. Hendriksen as CO-COUNSEL in this matter only. In the event Pro Hac Vice counsel has not yet received a login and password from the Clerk of Courts, they should promptly comply with the Courts Electronic Filing Policies and Procedures Manual which can be found at the Courts website, www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 10/27/20. (eh)
October 23, 2020 Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE: Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 11/23/2020. The Court will thereafter, pursuant to Rule 16(b), enter a Calendar Order or will set and hold a Scheduling Conference after which a Calendar Order will be issued. (km)
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 QUICKEN LOANS' ANSWER to #4 Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE and OTHER DEFENSES filed by Quicken Loans LLC. (Frooman, James)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 MERS' ANSWER to #4 Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE and OTHER DEFENSES filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.. (Frooman, James)
October 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $600 paid, receipt number 0648-7720135) of JOSEPH F. YENOUSKAS, BROOKS R. BROWN, PATRICE E. HENDRIKSEN by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., Quicken Loans LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Certificates of Good Standing) (Frooman, James)
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 Response re #1 Notice of Removal, by Plaintiff Samuel Voss. (Coates, Terence)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #6 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint to the extent that Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to one of the following dates: (1) If Plaintiff timely files a motion to remand, Defendants' deadline shall be tolled until this Court resolves that motion to remand, after which time counsel for both Plaintiff and Defendants shall promptly confer to set a new deadline; or (2) If Plaintiff does not timely file a motion to remand, Defendants deadline shall be 10/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/29/2020. (km)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint New date requested 10/23/2020. by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., Quicken Loans LLC. (Attachments: #1 Errata A to Motion to Extend Deadline) (Frooman, James)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (vp)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 8/19/2020 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A2002899) by Samuel Voss against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., Quicken Loans LLC. (eh)
September 22, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., Intercontinental Exchange Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Intercontinental Exchange Inc. for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc... (Frooman, James)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Quicken Loans LLC, Quicken Loans LLC identifying Corporate Parent Quicken Loans LLC for Quicken Loans LLC.. (Frooman, James)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Common Pleas, case number A2002899 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7667365), filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., Quicken Loans LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal) (Frooman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voss v. Quicken Loans LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Voss
Represented By: Dylan James Gould
Represented By: Wilbert Benjamin Markovits
Represented By: Matthew C. Metzger
Represented By: Justin Charles Walker
Represented By: Terence Richard Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.
Represented By: James C Frooman
Represented By: Brooks R. Brown
Represented By: Joseph F. Yenouskas
Represented By: Patrice E. Hendriksen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans LLC
Represented By: James C Frooman
Represented By: Brooks R. Brown
Represented By: Joseph F. Yenouskas
Represented By: Patrice E. Hendriksen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?