Peidous v. Commissioner of the United States Customs Border Patrol
Plaintiff: Charleston Wang and Vassili Peidous
Defendant: Mr. Mark A. Morgan, Chad F Wolf, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II, Attorney General William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States, Commissioner of the United States Customs Border Patrol, Secretary of the United States Citizenship & Immigration Services and Secretary of Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00765
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Referring Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Attorney General of the United States. (eh)
October 29, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Mailing: Certified mailing of Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (kh)
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Attorney General of the United States. Attorney General of the United States served on 10/9/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (Mamedova, Nazly) Modified docket text on 10/13/2020 (eh).
October 5, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney, Southern District of Ohio (kl)
October 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Charleston Cheng Kung Wang for Plaintiff Vassili Peidous (Wang, Charleston)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Charleston Cheng Kung Wang for Plaintiff Vassili Peidous (Wang, Charleston)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to U S Attorney Southern Ohio Cincinnati (Wang, Charleston)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Attorney General of the United States, Commissioner of the United States Customs Border Patrol, Secretary of Department of Homeland Security, Secretary of the United States Citizenship & Immigration Services. (bjc)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Wang, Charleston)
September 30, 2020 Notice of Correction: Clerk erroneously attached a pdf to doc. 8 . It was the same receipt attached to doc. #7 and has been deleted. (eh)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTATION ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nazly Mamedova as CO-COUNSEL is this matter only. In the event Pro Hac Vice counsel has not yet received a login and password from the Clerk of Courts, they should promptly comply with the Courts Electronic Filing Policies and Procedures Manual which can be found at the Courts website, www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 9/29/20. (eh)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 200.00, receipt number 100CIN040289 re #2 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nazly Mamedova, Esq. (eh)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STRIKING FROM THE RECORD DOC. 1-1. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 09/25/2020. (kaf)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Plaintiff Vassili Peidous re #1 Complaint Amended Civil Cover Sheet (Wang, Charleston)
September 24, 2020 If case is referred, it will be referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (art)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff Charleston Wang re #1 Complaint CXivil Cover Sheet (Wang, Charleston)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Charleston Cheng Kung Wang for Plaintiff Charleston Wang (Wang, Charleston)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nazly Mamedova, Esq. by Plaintiff Charleston Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certifcate of Good Standing) (Wang, Charleston) Modified on 9/29/2020 (eh).
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 *EXHIBITS STRICKEN PER DOC. #6 * COMPLAINT against Mark A. Morgan, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II, Chad F Wolf, William P. Barr ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7673230), filed by Charleston Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to K) (Wang, Charleston) Modified on 9/25/2020 (kaf). Modified on 9/25/2020 (kaf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peidous v. Commissioner of the United States Customs Border Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charleston Wang
Represented By: Charleston Cheng Kung Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vassili Peidous
Represented By: Nazly Mamedova
Represented By: Charleston Cheng Kung Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Mark A. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the United States Customs Border Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the United States Citizenship & Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?