Landeros Diaz v. Director, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
Plaintiff: JESUS ADRIAN LANDEROS DIAZ
Defendant: Senior Official perf Kenneth T Cuccinelli and Director, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv00779
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William Bryan King, II for Defendant Director, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services (King, William)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Director, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services. All Defendants. Defendant, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General served on 10/22/2020, Answer due 12/21/2020 (Betzold, James) Modified to add service date and answer date on 10/30/2020 (bjc).
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James Leo Betzold as CO-COUNSEL is this matter only. In the event Pro Hac Vice counsel has not yet received a login and password from the Clerk of Courts, they should promptly comply with the Courts Electronic Filing Policies and Procedures Manual which can be found at the Courts website, www.ohsd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 10/7/20. (eh)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7683853) of James Leo Betzhold by Plaintiff Jesus Adrian Landeros Diaz. (Nimer, Jennifer)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Director, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bjc)
October 1, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7682444), filed by JESUS ADRIAN LANDEROS DIAZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form) (Nimer, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landeros Diaz v. Director, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Official perf Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
Represented By: William Bryan King, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESUS ADRIAN LANDEROS DIAZ
Represented By: Jennifer E Nimer
Represented By: James Leo Betzold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?