Wilmington Trust, National Association v. PMC of Portsmouth, Ohio Inc.
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF REGISTERED HOLDERS OF WELLS FARGO COMMERCIAL MORTGAGE TRUST 2019-C51 COMMERCIAL MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2019-C51 and Wilmington Trust, National Association
Defendant: PMC of Portsmouth, Ohio Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00781
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Plaintiff Wilmington Trust, National Association of Filing Receiver Bond (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rasmussen, Katherine)
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT JUDGMENT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 11/04/2020. (kaf)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 11/04/2020. (kaf)
October 29, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Order to APPOINTING RECEIVER AND CONSENT JUDGMENT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE by Plaintiff Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AGREED ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER, #2 Exhibit CONSENT JUDGMENT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE) (Rasmussen, Katherine)
October 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James Harry Lagos for Defendant PMC of Portsmouth, Ohio Inc. (Lagos, James) Modified docket text on 10/29/2020 (kh).
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant PMC of Portsmouth, Ohio Inc.. PMC of Portsmouth, Ohio Inc. served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. (Mattes, William)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to PMC of Portsmouth, Ohio Inc.. (kl)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Mattes, William)
October 2, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Rasmussen for Plaintiff Wilmington Trust, National Association (Rasmussen, Katherine) Modified Docket Text to Fix Party Name on 10/2/2020 (bjc).
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Mattes, William) Modified Docket Text to Fix Party Name on 10/2/2020 (bjc).
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Mortgage Foreclosure against PMC of Portsmouth, Ohio Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7684434), filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R, #19 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mattes, William) Modified Docket Text to Fix Party Name on 10/2/2020 (bjc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Trust, National Association v. PMC of Portsmouth, Ohio Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF REGISTERED HOLDERS OF WELLS FARGO COMMERCIAL MORTGAGE TRUST 2019-C51 COMMERCIAL MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2019-C51
Represented By: Katherine A. Rasmussen
Represented By: William M Mattes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, National Association
Represented By: Katherine A. Rasmussen
Represented By: William M Mattes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMC of Portsmouth, Ohio Inc.
Represented By: James Harry Lagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?