Lee et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: Ken Lee and Tina Lee
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Distributing LLC, Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Merck & Co., Inc. d/b/a Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., AstraZeneca LP, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, The Procter & Gamble Company, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., The Procter & Gamble Distributing Co., The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company and Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00860
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 ***Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 2:20-cv-16459, filed 11/18/2020. (er)
November 17, 2020 Case transferred to District of New Jersey. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er)
November 17, 2020 Filing 16 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-29): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, this action is transferred to the District of New Jersey. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 11/16/2020; certified by the District of New Jersey's Clerk's Office on 11/16/2020. (er)
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-29): This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 11/16/2020. (er)
November 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Steinmetz for Defendant Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Steinmetz, Jennifer)
November 3, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals International AG identifying Corporate Parent Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Corporate Parent Takeda Pharmaceuticals International AG for Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc... (Naeem, Tariq)
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Tariq M Naeem for Defendant Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Naeem, Tariq)
November 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Dismissal of Defendants The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Distributing LLC, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company Only Without Prejudice, originally filed 10/9/2020 in Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, Case No. A 1902643. (kh) Modified to include original file date on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 3, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/2/2019 by Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, Case No. A 1902643. (kh) Modified to include date originally filed on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/24/2019 by The Procter & Gamble Distributing LLC in Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, Case No. A 1902643. (kh) Modified to include date originally filed on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 3, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/24/2019 by The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company in Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, Case No. A 1902643. (kh) Modified to include date originally filed on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/24/2019 by The Procter & Gamble Company in Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, Case No. A 1902643. (kh) Modified to include date originally filed on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 8/2/2019 by Merck & Co., Inc. d/b/a Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation in Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, Case No. A 1902643. (kh) Modified to include original file date on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand, originally filed 8/2/2019 by AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP in Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, Case No. A 1902643. (kh) Modified to include original date filed on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/5/2019 by Abbott Laboratories in Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, Case No. A 1902643. kh) Modified dkt txt to include date originally filed on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 5/31/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902643) by Ken Lee, Tina Lee against Abbott Laboratories, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Merck & Co., Inc. d/b/a Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation, Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Distributing LLC, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company, (kh) Modified dkt txt to include state court case number on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 2, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kh)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Defendant Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Amended Civil Coversheet (Naeem, Tariq)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A 1902643 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7732156), filed by Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Combined State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit B - Transfer Order) (Naeem, Tariq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Distributing LLC
Represented By: Emily Serger Prem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Development Center Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc. d/b/a Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Jennifer L. Steinmetz
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca LP
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company
Represented By: Emily Serger Prem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Distributing Co.
Represented By: Emily Serger Prem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Emily Serger Prem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc.
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Lee
Represented By: Brian P. O'Connor
Represented By: John D. Holschuh, III
Represented By: John David Holschuh, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Lee
Represented By: Brian P. O'Connor
Represented By: John D. Holschuh, III
Represented By: John David Holschuh, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?