Morris v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: Tanya G Morris
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Merck & Co Inc dba Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceutical Corporation, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, Novartis Consumer Health, Inc., AstraZeneca LP, Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc., Takeda Development Center Americas Inc fka Takeda Global Research, Pfizer Inc, The Procter & Gamble Company, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Novartis Institutes For Biomedical Research Inc., Novartis Corporation, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company, The Procter & Gamble Distributing LLC fka PG Distributing Co and Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited
Case Number: 1:2020cv00861
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 ***Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 2:20-cv-16466, filed 11/18/2020. (er)
November 17, 2020 Case transferred to District of New Jersey. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er)
November 17, 2020 Filing 15 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-29): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, this action is transferred to the District of New Jersey. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 11/16/2020; certified by the District of New Jersey's Clerk's Office on 11/16/2020. (er)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-29): This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 11/16/2020. (er)
November 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Dismissal of Defendants The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company and the Procter & Gamble Distributing LLC F/K/A The Procter & Gamble Distributing Co., only without Prejudice, originally filed 10/9/2020 in Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, Case No. A1902645. (kh) Modified to include original file date on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 8/6/2019 by Novartis Corporation, Novartis Institutes For Biomedical Research Inc., Novartis Pharmaceutical Corporation, Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. in Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, Case No. A1902645. (kh) Modified to include original file date on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 8/2/2019 by Merck & Co Inc dba Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation in Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, Case No. A1902645.(kh) Modified to include original file date on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 8/2/2019 by AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. in Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, Case No. A1902645. (kh) Modified to include original file date on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint originally filed 7/24/2019 by The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company in Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, Case No. A1902645. (kh) Modified to include original file date on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint originally filed 7/24/2019 by The Procter & Gamble Distributing LLC fka PG Distributing Co. in Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, Case No. A1902645. (kh) Modified to include original file date on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint originally filed 7/24/2019 by The Procter & Gamble Company in Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, Case No. A1902645. (kh) Modified to include original file date on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/8/2019 by Pfizer Inc. in Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, Case No. A1902645. (kh) Modified to include original file date on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/8/2019 by GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, Novartis Consumer Health, Inc. in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, Case No. A1902645.(kh) Modified to include original file date on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/5/2019 by Abbott Laboratories in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, Case No. A1902645.(kh) Modified to include original file date on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/2/2019 by Takeda Development Center Americas Inc fka Takeda Global Research, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, Case No. A1902645. (kh) Modified to include original file date on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 5/31/2019 against Abbott Laboratories, AstraZeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, Merck & Co Inc dba Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, Novartis Consumer Health, Inc., Novartis Corporation, Novartis Institutes For Biomedical Research Inc., Novartis Pharmaceutical Corporation, Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc., Pfizer Inc, Takeda Development Center Americas Inc fka Takeda Global Research, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Distributing LLC fka PG Distributing Co, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company, by Tanya G Morris in the Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, Case No. A 1902645. (kh) Modified on 11/5/2020 (kl).
November 2, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kh)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A 1902645 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7732216), filed by Novartis Consumer Health, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit B - Transfer Order) (Feichtner, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co Inc dba Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceutical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC
Represented By: Douglas J Feichtner
Represented By: Frank Chester Woodside, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Consumer Health, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas J Feichtner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca LP
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Development Center Americas Inc fka Takeda Global Research
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company
Represented By: Emily Serger Prem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Represented By: Kristina S. Dahmann
Represented By: Lydia Reback
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Institutes For Biomedical Research Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Emily Serger Prem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Distributing LLC fka PG Distributing Co
Represented By: Emily Serger Prem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited
Represented By: Tariq M Naeem
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya G Morris
Represented By: John David Holschuh, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?