Behymer v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: Teresa A Behymer
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Takeda Development Center Americas Inc fka Takeda Global Research, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc., AstraZeneca LP, Novartis Consumer Health, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Pfizer Inc, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, The Procter & Gamble Company, GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Novartis Institutes For Biomedical Research Inc., Novartis Corporation, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company, Merck & Co., Inc. d/b/a Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, Takeda Development Center Americas Inc., Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc. and Merck & Co., Inc. doing business as Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00866
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 ***Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 2:20-cv-16514, filed 11/19/2020. (er)
November 17, 2020 Case transferred to District of New Jersey. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er)
November 17, 2020 Filing 14 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-29): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, this action is transferred to the District of New Jersey. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 11/16/2020; certified by the District of New Jersey's Clerk's Office on 11/16/2020. (er)
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-29): This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 11/16/2020. (er)
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 8/6/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902638) by Novartis Consumer Health, Inc., Novartis Corporation, Novartis Institutes For Biomedical Research Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. (eh)
November 3, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 8/2/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902638) filed by Merck & Co., Inc. d/b/a Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation. (eh)
November 3, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 8/2/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902638) by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP. (eh) Modified on 11/3/2020 (eh).
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/23/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902638) filed by The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company. (eh)
November 3, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/23/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902638) by The Procter & Gamble Company. (eh)
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/8/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902638) by Pfizer Inc. (eh)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/8/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902638) by GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC, Novartis Consumer Health, Inc. (eh)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/5/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902638) by Abbott Laboratories. (eh)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 7/2/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902638) by Takeda Development Center Americas Inc fka Takeda Global Research, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (eh) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/4/2020) (eh).
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 5/30/2019 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A1902638) by Teresa A Behymer against All Defendants. (eh)
November 3, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Douglas R. Cole for all further proceedings. Judge Susan J. Dlott no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 11/2/20. (eh)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A1902638 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7732426), filed by Novartis Consumer Health, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit B - Transfer Order) (Feichtner, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Behymer v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Development Center Americas Inc fka Takeda Global Research
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc.
Represented By: Joyce Dee Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca LP
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Consumer Health, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas J Feichtner
Represented By: Joyce Dee Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Robert Alexander Pitcairn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Joyce Dee Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC
Represented By: Douglas J Feichtner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Institutes For Biomedical Research Inc.
Represented By: Joyce Dee Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Corporation
Represented By: Joyce Dee Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc. d/b/a Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Development Center Americas Inc.
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Global Research & Development Center, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory D Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc. doing business as Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation
Represented By: Daniel M Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa A Behymer
Represented By: John David Holschuh, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?