Rockey v. Cary et al
Plaintiff: Tammatha M Rockey
Defendant: John M Cary, Furniture By Appointment, Furniture Finance Connection, SYNCHRONY BANK, Mattress by Appointment Cincinnati, LLC and Furniture Finance Connection LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00900
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by Plaintiff Tammatha M Rockey of Election of Remedies Under State Law (Shane, Steven)
December 28, 2020 Filing 18 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE: Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 2/12/2021. The Court will thereafter, pursuant to Rule 16(b), enter a Calendar Order or will set and hold a Scheduling Conference after which a Calendar Order will be issued. (km)
December 24, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 12/24/2020. (To file/submit Statutory Cure Offer) by Defendants John M Cary, Furniture Finance Connection LLC, Mattress by Appointment Cincinnati, LLC. (Eagle, Thomas)
December 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Defendants John M Cary, Furniture Finance Connection LLC, Mattress by Appointment Cincinnati, LLC (Statutory Cure Offer) (Eagle, Thomas)
December 24, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #4 Complaint filed by John M Cary, Furniture Finance Connection LLC, Mattress by Appointment Cincinnati, LLC. (Eagle, Thomas)
December 24, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Mattress by Appointment Cincinnati, LLC. (Eagle, Thomas)
December 24, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Furniture Finance Connection LLC. (Eagle, Thomas)
December 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G Eagle for Defendant Mattress by Appointment Cincinnati, LLC (Eagle, Thomas)
December 23, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Synchrony Bank, Synchrony Financial identifying Corporate Parent Synchrony Financial for Synchrony Bank.. (Wallace, David)
December 23, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #4 Complaint filed by Synchrony Bank. (Wallace, David)
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G Eagle for Defendants John M Cary, Furniture Finance Connection LLC (Eagle, Thomas)
December 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Synchrony Bank answer due 12/27/2020. (kh)
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Plaintiff Tammatha M Rockey of Extension Allowed to Defendants Cary and Furniture Finance Connection, LLC of time to Plead or Otherwise Answer Her Complaint Until December 27, 2020 (Shane, Steven)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Synchrony Bank. (Wallace, David)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Synchrony Bank. Synchrony Bank served on 11/14/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Shane, Steven)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Plaintiff Tammatha M Rockey re #4 Complaint (Shane, Steven)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND Corrected Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Tammatha M Rockey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Shane, Steven)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (vp)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John M Cary, Furniture Finance Connection LLC, Mattress by Appointment Cincinnati, LLC, Synchrony Bank. (eh)
November 9, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7744585), filed by Tammatha M Rockey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Sales Agreement, #2 Exhibit B Purported Dislcosure, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Form John M. Cary, #5 Summons Form Synchrony Bank, #6 Summons Form Furniture Finance Connection, #7 Summons Form Matttress By Appointment Cincinnati) (Shane, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockey v. Cary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M Cary
Represented By: Thomas G Eagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furniture By Appointment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furniture Finance Connection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNCHRONY BANK
Represented By: Tyler Kabaki Ibom
Represented By: David A Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattress by Appointment Cincinnati, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G Eagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furniture Finance Connection LLC
Represented By: Thomas G Eagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammatha M Rockey
Represented By: Steven Charles Shane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?