DOE et al v. Miami University
Plaintiff: JANE ROE and JANE DOE
Defendant: Miami University
Case Number: 1:2020cv00905
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SEAL EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 11/16/2020. (kaf)
November 16, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibits by Plaintiffs JANE DOE, JANE ROE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Long, Eric)
November 12, 2020 ***Civil case terminated per Doc. #10 . (kaf)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Doc. #10 , the Telephone Conference set for 11/12/2020 is vacated. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 11/12/2020. (kaf) Modified on 11/12/2020 (kaf).
November 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs JANE DOE, JANE ROE (Long, Eric)
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Medora Akers for Defendant Miami University (Akers, Medora)
November 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth A. Bryan for Defendant Miami University (Bryan, Beth)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Ann Albeit for Plaintiffs JANE DOE, JANE ROE (Albeit, Leslie)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Miami University. (kl)
November 10, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kl)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs JANE DOE, JANE ROE. (Long, Eric). Added MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on 11/10/2020 (kl).
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Permission to Proceed Under Pseudonym by Plaintiffs JANE DOE, JANE ROE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Long, Eric)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Long, Eric)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiffs JANE DOE, JANE ROE re #1 Complaint,,, Civil Cover Sheet (Long, Eric)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Miami University ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7747278), filed by JANE DOE, JANE ROE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Notice Letter- Doe, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Notice Letter- Roe, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C- Hearing Notice- Doe, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D- Hearing Notice- Roe, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E- Outcome- Doe, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F- Outcome- Roe, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G- Appeal- Roe, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H- Appeal- Doe, #9 Exhibit H1- Appeal Exhibit 1, #10 Exhibit H2- Appeal- Exhibit 2, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I- Appeal Decision Letter- Doe, #12 Exhibit Exhibit J- Appeal Decision Letter- Roe, #13 Exhibit Exhibit K- Decision Letter- EL, #14 Exhibit Exhibit L- Letter- Doe, #15 Exhibit Exhibit M- Additional PPW-Roe, #16 Exhibit Exhibit N- Healthy Together Pledge) (Long, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE et al v. Miami University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE ROE
Represented By: Eric Franklin Long
Represented By: Leslie Ann Albeit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Represented By: Eric Franklin Long
Represented By: Leslie Ann Albeit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami University
Represented By: Beth A. Bryan
Represented By: Medora Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?