Hall et al v. Cullinan et al
Plaintiff: Alien Technologies Corp. and Frederick Hall
Defendant: Lynx Precision Products Corporation and John D Cullinan
Case Number: 1:2020cv00918
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Alien Technologies Corp., Frederick Hall filed by John D Cullinan. (Schoen, Ann)
December 28, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Counter Claimant Lynx Precision Products Corporation, Defendant Lynx Precision Products Corporation. (Schoen, Ann)
December 28, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Alien Technologies Corp., Frederick Hall filed by Lynx Precision Products Corporation. (Schoen, Ann)
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant John D Cullinan. John D Cullinan served on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. (Gaum, Richard)
December 10, 2020 Reset Deadlines re doc. #9 : Lynx Precision Products Corporation answer due 12/29/2020. (eh)
December 9, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendant Lynx Precision Products Corporation. (Schoen, Ann)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Lynx Precision Products Corporation. Lynx Precision Products Corporation served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (Gaum, Richard)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to John D Cullinan, Lynx Precision Products Corporation. (bjc)
November 13, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Alien Technologies Corp., Frederick Hall - Civil Cover Sheet (Holman, Ronald)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Alien Technologies Corp.. (Holman, Ronald)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. - John D. Cullinan (Holman, Ronald)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. - Lynx Precision Products Corporation (Holman, Ronald)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7752229), filed by Frederick Hall, Alien Technologies Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 9,643,823, #2 Exhibit Confidentiality Agreement) (Holman, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Cullinan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alien Technologies Corp.
Represented By: Ronald D. Holman, II
Represented By: Richard Eric Gaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Hall
Represented By: Ronald D. Holman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynx Precision Products Corporation
Represented By: Ann Gallagher Schoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D Cullinan
Represented By: Ann Gallagher Schoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?