K7 Design Group, Inc. v. The Kroger Co.
Plaintiff: K7 Design Group, Inc.
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00975
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to The Kroger Co. (c/o Corporation Service Company). (bjc)
December 16, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant The Kroger Co.. The Kroger Co. served on 12/11/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (bjc)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J. Horwitz, Andrew J. Luskin, and Andrew E. Tomback as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 12/9/2020. (eh)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Envelopes) (bjc)
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $600 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-7834664) of Daniel J. Horwitz, Andrew J. Luskin, Andrew E. Tomback by Plaintiff K7 Design Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Horwitz Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Luskin Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Tomback Certificate of Good Standing) (Coates, Terence)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The Kroger Co. (kh)
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. The Kroger Company c/o Statutory Agent Corporation Service Company (Markovits, Wilbert)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. The Kroger Company (Markovits, Wilbert)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M De Marco for Plaintiff K7 Design Group, Inc. (De Marco, Paul)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Terence Richard Coates for Plaintiff K7 Design Group, Inc. (Coates, Terence)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Kroger Co. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-7812069), filed by K7 Design Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Markovits, Wilbert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K7 Design Group, Inc. v. The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K7 Design Group, Inc.
Represented By: Terence Richard Coates
Represented By: Paul M De Marco
Represented By: Wilbert Benjamin Markovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?