Spectrum Laboratories, LLC v. 513 Ventures LLC
Plaintiff: Spectrum Laboratories, LLC
Defendant: 513 Ventures, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00986
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Stay THE PROCEEDINGS filed by Defendant 513 Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (O'Connell, Brian)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Notation Order: This matter is before the Court on the parties' #27 Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines. For good cause shown, and the reasons stated therein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties' #27 Joint Motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendant's reply regarding its Motion to Stay is due on January 11, 2021, and Plaintiff's deadline to move, plead, or otherwise respond to Defendant's counterclaim is due either two weeks after the Court rules on Defendant's Motion to Stay, if a stay is denied, or two weeks after the stay is lifted, if a stay is granted. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/4/2021. (ba)
December 31, 2020 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #26 Response in Opposition to Motion, #25 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim New date requested 12/30/2021. (two weeks after ruling on motion to stay), Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 12/30/2021. (1/11/21 is new date requested) ( Responses due by 1/21/2021) by Counter Defendant Spectrum Laboratories, LLC. (Cavanagh, Matthew)
December 30, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Stay THE PROCEEDINGS filed by Counter Defendant Spectrum Laboratories, LLC, Plaintiff Spectrum Laboratories, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Spectrum's Motion to Dismiss or Stay the State Court Case, #2 Exhibit B - Stipulation to Dismiss Tandberg, #3 Exhibit C - Dismissal of Synthetix5) (Cupar, David)
December 16, 2020 Filing 25 DEFENDANT 513 VENTURES, LLCS ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Spectrum Laboratories, LLC filed by 513 Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (O'Connell, Brian)
December 15, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay THE PROCEEDINGS by Defendant 513 Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (O'Connell, Brian)
December 10, 2020 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett #22 Motion for Hearing - Status Conference held on 12/10/2020: Matthew Cavanagh and David Cupar appeared for plaintiff; Chrles Brown, Brian O'Connell and Stephen Schmidt appeared for defendant; defendant to file their Motion to Stay by 12/15/2020; response due 1/4/2021; plus 7 days for a reply; responses to the #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction are stayed at this time. (ba)
December 9, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Hampton Brown, III for Defendant 513 Ventures, LLC (Brown, Charles)
December 8, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Hearing REQUEST FOR INFORMAL PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE by Defendant 513 Ventures, LLC. (Schmidt, Stephen)
December 8, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kh)
December 7, 2020 Judge Michael R. Barrett added. (er)
December 7, 2020 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-02333. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order of Transfer . The court finds the Motion to Transfer well-taken, especially in light of Spectrum's Stipulation. Because 513 Ventures operates only in Cincinnati, venue does not lie in this district under 28 U.S.C. 1400 and controlling patent and copyright case law. But the court finds that justice is better served by transfer rather than dismissal. Accordingly, the court hereby transfers this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio, where the action could have been brought initially. 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), 1406(a). Related documents #14 , #16 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 12/2/2020. (R,Sh) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/7/2020.]
December 1, 2020 Filing 16 Proposed Stipulation to transfer venue to the Southern District of Ohio filed by Spectrum Laboratories, LLC. (Cavanagh, Matthew) Modified text on 12/1/2020 (S,SR). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/7/2020.]
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Brian J. O'Connell for 513 Ventures LLC. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #13 ). Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 11/6/2020.(R,Sh) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/7/2020.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by 513 Ventures LLC. (Schmidt, Stephen) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/7/2020.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to dismiss case for improper venue filed by Defendant 513 Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit John Mullen)(Schmidt, Stephen) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/7/2020.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 13 Motion for attorney Brian J. O'Connell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10399984, filed by Defendant 513 Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Schmidt, Stephen) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/7/2020.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 12 Attorney Appearance by Stephen S. Schmidt filed by on behalf of 513 Ventures LLC. (Schmidt, Stephen) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/7/2020.]
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 Affidavit/Declaration of Matt Cavanagh in support of preliminary injunction filed by Spectrum Laboratories, LLC. Related document(s) #9 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reddit, #2 Exhibit B - Website, #3 Exhibit C - Facebook)(Cupar, David) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/7/2020.]
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 October 2020 declaration of Matthew Stephens filed by Spectrum Laboratories, LLC. Related document(s) #9 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Emails)(Cupar, David) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/7/2020.]
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Plaintiff Spectrum Laboratories, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - McCarthy, #3 Proposed Order)(Cupar, David) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/7/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service by personal service executed upon 513 Ventures LLC on 10/16/2020, filed on behalf of Spectrum Laboratories, LLC (Cavanagh, Matthew) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/7/2020.]
October 14, 2020 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (L,MI) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/7/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon 513 Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/7/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/7/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (L,MI) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/7/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Spectrum Laboratories, LLC. (Cavanagh, Matthew) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/7/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Spectrum Laboratories, LLC. (Cavanagh, Matthew) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/7/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Supplement to Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet and Summons, filed by Spectrum Laboratories, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Cavanagh, Matthew) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/7/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against 513 Ventures LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10338890. Filed by Spectrum Laboratories, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (776 Patent), #2 Exhibit B (105 Patent), #3 Exhibit C (Quick Fix Trademark Registration), #4 Exhibit D (Q Trademark Registration), #5 Exhibit E (Q-Clock Copyright Registration), #6 Exhibit F (Termination Letter), #7 Exhibit G (Lawsuit Letter from 513 Ventures), #8 Exhibit H (Screenshots of infringing websites)) (Cavanagh, Matthew) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spectrum Laboratories, LLC v. 513 Ventures LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spectrum Laboratories, LLC
Represented By: David B Cupar
Represented By: Matthew J Cavanagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 513 Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Stephen S Schmidt
Represented By: Brian J O'Connell
Represented By: Charles Hampton Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?