Camp Bow Wow Franchising, Inc. v. Shear Pawfection, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Camp Bow Wow Franchising, Inc.
Defendant: Shear Pawfection, LLC, Centerville Shopping Center, LLC and 4032 Linden Avenue, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00993
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Shear Pawfection, LLC. (Linden, Paul)
February 5, 2021 Filing 19 Defendant Shear Pawfection, LLC ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Affirmative Defense, CROSSCLAIM against 4032 Linden Avenue, LLC, Centerville Shopping Center, LLC filed by Shear Pawfection, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Intent to Lease, #2 Exhibit Lease Agreement) (Linden, Paul)
February 5, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS 4032 LINDEN AVENUE, LLC AND CENTERVILLE SHOPPING CENTER LLC; WITH JURY DEMAND ENDORSED HEREON ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by 4032 Linden Avenue, LLC, Centerville Shopping Center, LLC. (Sandner, Michael)
January 5, 2021 Reset Deadlines per Doc #17 : Shear Pawfection, LLC answer due 2/5/2021. (kh)
January 5, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION (Joint) for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Shear Pawfection, LLC. (Linden, Paul)
January 4, 2021 Reset Deadlines per doc. #16 : 4032 Linden Avenue, LLC answer due 2/5/2021; Centerville Shopping Center, LLC answer due 2/5/2021. (eh)
December 31, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION DEFENDANTS 4032 LINDEN AVENUE, LLC AND CENTERVILLE SHOPPING CENTER, LLC'S STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Defendants 4032 Linden Avenue, LLC, Centerville Shopping Center, LLC. (Sandner, Michael)
December 31, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W Sandner and James I. Weprin for Defendant Centerville Shopping Center, LLC (Sandner, Michael) Modified docket text on 1/4/2021 (eh).
December 31, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W Sandner and James I. Weprin for Defendant 4032 Linden Avenue, LLC (Sandner, Michael) Modified docket text on 1/4/2021 (eh).
December 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Jason Linden for Defendant Shear Pawfection, LLC (Linden, Paul)
December 22, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Shear Pawfection, LLC. Shear Pawfection, LLC served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (Besl, April)
December 17, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Centerville Shopping Center, LLC. Centerville Shopping Center, LLC served on 12/16/2020, answer due 1/6/2021. (Besl, April)
December 17, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant 4032 Linden Avenue, LLC. 4032 Linden Avenue, LLC served on 12/16/2020, answer due 1/6/2021. (Besl, April)
December 11, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to 4032 Linden Avenue, LLC, Centerville Shopping Center, LLC, Shear Pawfection, LLC. (kh)
December 11, 2020 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kh)
December 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Liane Harmon Rousseau for Plaintiff Camp Bow Wow Franchising, Inc. (Rousseau, Liane)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaci L. Overmann for Plaintiff Camp Bow Wow Franchising, Inc. (Overmann, Jaci)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Camp Bow Wow Franchising, Inc., VCA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent VCA Inc. for Camp Bow Wow Franchising, Inc... (Besl, April)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Centerville Shopping Center, LLC (Besl, April)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to 4032 Linden Avenue, LLC (Besl, April)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Shear Pawfection, LLC (Besl, April)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-7848805), filed by Camp Bow Wow Franchising, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M) (Besl, April)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camp Bow Wow Franchising, Inc. v. Shear Pawfection, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shear Pawfection, LLC
Represented By: Paul Jason Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerville Shopping Center, LLC
Represented By: Michael W Sandner
Represented By: James Irving Weprin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4032 Linden Avenue, LLC
Represented By: Michael W Sandner
Represented By: James Irving Weprin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camp Bow Wow Franchising, Inc.
Represented By: April Lynn Besl
Represented By: Jaci L. Overmann
Represented By: Liane Harmon Rousseau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?