Smith v. Mercy Health-Clermont Hospital, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie A. Smith
Defendant: Jane and/or John Doe # 1-5 Employees, Agents and/or Servants Whose Identities and Addresses are Unknown, US Acute Care Solutions d/b/a Acute Care Specialist, Inc., Roger Chang, M.D., Mercy Health-Clermont Hospital, LLC, LabCorp Dublin d/b/a Laboratory Corporation of America, Samantha Yelley, D.O., HealthSource of Ohio Family Practice, LabCorp Dublin doing business as Laboratory Corporation of America, United States of America, US Acute Care Solutions doing business as Acute Care Specialist, Inc., Samantha Yelley, DO, Roger Chang and Jane and/or John Doe
Case Number: 1:2021cv00057
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant LabCorp Dublin. (Jolley, Tyler)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #10 United States of America's Amended Motion for Extension of Time. Counsel for Plaintiff indicated via email to the Court that the Motion is unopposed. United States of America to answer, move, or otherwise plead by 3/29/21. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 2/17/21. (sct)
February 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Defendant United States of America Notice of Substitution of the United States of America as Defendant for Roger Chang, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Scope Certification) (Castro, Margaret)
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 3/29/2021. United States of America's Amended Motion for Extension of Time by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Castro, Margaret)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 5/9/2021. United States of America's Motion for Extension of Time by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Castro, Margaret)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick B Healy for Defendant LabCorp Dublin (Healy, Patrick)
January 27, 2021 Filing 7 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorneys T. David Burgess and Patrick A. Healy. (eh)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand to #2 Complaint originally filed 12/22/2020 in Clermont County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. 2020 CVA 00889) by LabCorp Dublin, Jane and/or John Doe. (eh)
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 Amended ANSWER with Jury Demand to #2 Complaint originally filed 11/24/2020 in Clermont County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. 2020 CVA 00889) by Mercy Health-Clermont Hospital, LLC. (eh)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand to #2 Complaint originally filed 11/24/2020 in Clermont County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. 2020 CVA 00889) by Mercy Health-Clermont Hospital, LLC. (eh)
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER with Jury Demand to #2 Complaint originally filed 11/20/2020 in Clermont County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. 2020 CVA 00889) by US Acute Care Solutions, Samantha Yelley, DO. (eh)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 10/23/2020 in Clermont County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. 2020 CVA 00889) by Stephanie A. Smith against Roger Chang, Jane and/or John Doe #1-5, HealthSource of Ohio Family Practice, LabCorp Dublin, Mercy Health-Clermont Hospital, LLC, US Acute Care Solutions, Samantha Yelley, DO. (eh)
January 27, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clermont County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020 CVA 00889, filed by HealthSource of Ohio Family Practice. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-Complaint, #4 Exhibit B-Answer of Labcorp Dublin, #5 Exhibit C-Amended Answer of Mercy Helath-Clermont Hospital, LLC, #6 Exhibit D-Answer of Mercy Helath-Clermont Hospital, LLC, #7 Exhibit E-Answer of US Acute Care Solutions and Samantha Yelley, D.O., #8 Exhibit F-Motion of HealthSource of OH, Batavia Family Practice and Roger Chang, M.D) (Castro, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Mercy Health-Clermont Hospital, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and/or John Doe # 1-5 Employees, Agents and/or Servants Whose Identities and Addresses are Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Acute Care Solutions d/b/a Acute Care Specialist, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Chang, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy Health-Clermont Hospital, LLC
Represented By: C. Jessica Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LabCorp Dublin d/b/a Laboratory Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Yelley, D.O.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthSource of Ohio Family Practice
Represented By: Margaret A Castro
Represented By: Mary Pamela Popp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LabCorp Dublin doing business as Laboratory Corporation of America
Represented By: Patrick B Healy
Represented By: Tyler Martin Jolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Margaret A Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Acute Care Solutions doing business as Acute Care Specialist, Inc.
Represented By: David S Lockemeyer
Represented By: Stephanie Phillips Franckewitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Yelley, DO
Represented By: David S Lockemeyer
Represented By: Stephanie Phillips Franckewitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Chang
Represented By: Mary Pamela Popp
Represented By: Margaret A Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and/or John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie A. Smith
Represented By: Kristopher David Burgess
Represented By: Lindsay Ann Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?