R.Z. by parent B.Z. v. Cincinnati Public Schools et al
Plaintiff: R. Z. by parent B.Z.
Defendant: Ben Lindy, Walnut Hills High School, Carolyn Jones, Melanie Bates, Lauren Mitchell, Ryan Messer, Pamela Bowers, Mike Moroski, John Chambers, Cincinnati Public Schools and Eve Bolton
Case Number: 1:2021cv00140
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #16 Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery. Defendants and Plaintiff shall file their Rule 26(f) report as soon as possible, not later than 5/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 4/26/2021. (km)
April 22, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 5/13/2021), MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Melanie Bates, Eve Bolton, Pamela Bowers, John Chambers, Cincinnati Public Schools, Carolyn Jones, Ben Lindy, Ryan Messer, Lauren Mitchell, Mike Moroski, Walnut Hills High School. (Neff, Jeremy)
April 19, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY filed by Plaintiff R. Z. by parent B.Z.. (Donnellon, Daniel)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CONSENT ENTRY AND ORDER TO STAY - It is ORDERED that all activity in this action shall be stayed for 30 days from the date of the entry of this Order. Specifically, and not by way of limitation, this stay shall extendthe time to move, plead, or otherwise respond for the duration of the stay.It is further ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery #16 remains pending, but will be held in abeyance during this stay. Once the stay is lifted, the briefing schedule under the local rules will resume and the Motion submitted. It is further ORDERED that this stay shall be automatically lifted upon expiration of the 30th day after entry of this Order. It can also be lifted upon application to the Court by any party setting forth good cause for lifting the stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 3/19/2021. (km)
March 12, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy John Neff for Defendants Melanie Bates, Eve Bolton, Pamela Bowers, John Chambers, Cincinnati Public Schools, Carolyn Jones, Ben Lindy, Ryan Messer, Lauren Mitchell, Mike Moroski, Walnut Hills High School (Neff, Jeremy)
March 12, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Mike Moroski. Mike Moroski served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Donnellon, Daniel)
March 12, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Melanie Bates, Eve Bolton, Pamela Bowers, John Chambers, Cincinnati Public Schools, Carolyn Jones, Ben Lindy, Ryan Messer, Lauren Mitchell, Mike Moroski, Walnut Hills High School. All Defendants. (Donnellon, Daniel)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 3/11/2021. (km)
March 9, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Telephone Conference held on 3/9/2021. Attorneys Daniel Donnellon and Kaitlyn Meeks appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorneys Jeremy Neff, Dan Hoying and Stephanie Scott appeared on behalf of Defendants. Without waiving any jurisdictional arguments, counsel for Defendants appeared along with counsel for Plaintiff. A discussion was had re: the motion for protective order #17 . The parties came to an agreement and will submit a proposed order to chambers on or before 3/12/2021. Plaintiff's motion to expedite discovery #16 is held in abeyance pending further discussions on the Court's suggestion on how best to proceed. (km)
March 9, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, #17 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Melanie Bates, Eve Bolton, Pamela Bowers, John Chambers, Cincinnati Public Schools, Carolyn Jones, Ben Lindy, Ryan Messer, Lauren Mitchell, Mike Moroski, Walnut Hills High School. (Neff, Jeremy)
March 4, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlyn C. Meeks for Plaintiff R. Z. by parent B.Z. (Meeks, Kaitlyn)
March 4, 2021 Filing 17 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff R. Z. by parent B.Z.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Protective Order) (Donnellon, Daniel)
March 3, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY by Plaintiff R. Z. by parent B.Z.. (Donnellon, Daniel)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 03/02/2021. (kaf)
March 2, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Melanie Bates, Eve Bolton, Pamela Bowers, John Chambers, Cincinnati Public Schools, Carolyn Jones, Ben Lindy, Ryan Messer, Lauren Mitchell, Mike Moroski, Walnut Hills High School. (kh)
March 2, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kh)
March 1, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Walnut Hills High School) (Donnellon, Daniel)
March 1, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Ryan Messer) (Donnellon, Daniel)
March 1, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Pamela Bowers) (Donnellon, Daniel)
March 1, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Mike Moroski) (Donnellon, Daniel)
March 1, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Melanie Bates) (Donnellon, Daniel)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Lauren Mitchell) (Donnellon, Daniel)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (John Chambers) (Donnellon, Daniel)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Eve Bolton) (Donnellon, Daniel)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Cincinnati Public Schools) (Donnellon, Daniel)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Carolyn Jones) (Donnellon, Daniel)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Ben Lindy) (Donnellon, Daniel)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff R. Z. by parent B.Z. re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Donnellon, Daniel)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8179514), filed by R. Z. by parent B.Z.. (Donnellon, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.Z. by parent B.Z. v. Cincinnati Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Lindy
Represented By: Jeremy John Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walnut Hills High School
Represented By: Jeremy John Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Jones
Represented By: Jeremy John Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Bates
Represented By: Jeremy John Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Mitchell
Represented By: Jeremy John Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Messer
Represented By: Jeremy John Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Bowers
Represented By: Jeremy John Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Moroski
Represented By: Jeremy John Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chambers
Represented By: Jeremy John Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Public Schools
Represented By: Jeremy John Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eve Bolton
Represented By: Jeremy John Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Z. by parent B.Z.
Represented By: Daniel John Donnellon
Represented By: Kaitlyn C. Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?