Bidhany v. Butler County Sheriff et al
Petitioner: Aqeel Kadhim Al Bidhany
Respondent: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Butler County Sheriff
Case Number: 1:2021cv00285
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT this case should be dismissed for Petitioner's failure to comply with the Court's 4/26/2021 Deficiency Order #2 . Objections to R&R due by 6/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 6/3/2021. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN of Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondent Butler County Sheriff. (Ferguson, Danny)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Danny Lee Ferguson for Respondent Butler County Sheriff (Ferguson, Danny)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT within 30 days of the date of filing of this Order, Petitioner shall pay the full filing fee of $5.00 or submit a completed Application and Affidavit By Incarcerated Person to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees form, including the "Certificate" page (page 8 of the application and affidavit to proceed without prepayment of fees that is used in this Court, completed and signed by the institutional cashier) showing the balance of his prisoner account. Petitioner is advised that his failure to comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this action for want of prosecution. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to submit to Petitioner an Application and Affidavit By Incarcerated Person to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees form. The Clerk of Court is further DIRECTED to send a copy of this Deficiency Order to the cashier of the prison at which petitioner is confined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 4/26/2021. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Civil Cover Sheet) by Petitioner Aqeel Kadhim Al Bidhany. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bidhany v. Butler County Sheriff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aqeel Kadhim Al Bidhany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Butler County Sheriff
Represented By: Danny Lee Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?