Setters et al v. The Medical Protective Company Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dana Setters and Craig Setters
Defendant: The Medical Protective Company Inc., Medpro Group, Inc. f/k/a Medical Protecive Corporation, an Indiana Corporation, Medpro Group, Inc. and Medical Protective Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv00422
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Filing 13 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiffs Craig Setters, Dana Setters. (Maus, James)
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Due to the Premature Filing of the Complaint by a Third Party before a Final Judgment Has Been Entered as Required by O.R.C. Section 3929.06, with Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Craig Setters, Dana Setters. (Winter, Robert)
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company Inc.. (Harrison, Gregory)
July 20, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Due to the Premature Filing of the Complaint by a Third Party before a Final Judgment Has Been Entered as Required by O.R.C. Section 3929.06, with Memorandum in Support by Defendants Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company Inc.. (Harrison, Gregory)
July 19, 2021 NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/9/2021. Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms; (ba)
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D Porotsky, Jr for Defendants Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company Inc. (Porotsky, Richard)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company Inc.. (Harrison, Gregory)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Alan Harrison for Defendants Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company Inc. (Harrison, Gregory)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 1:20-cv-170 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Michael R. Barrett for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 06/29/2021. (bjc)
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Not Effectuated related to COVID19) as to Defendants Medpro Group, Inc., and The Medical Protective Company Inc. Medpro Group, Inc. served on 6/25/2021, answer due 7/16/2021; The Medical Protective Company Inc. served on 6/25/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. (kh)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Envelopes) (bjc)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Medpro Group, Inc., The Medical Protective Company Inc.. (bjc)
June 22, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8370465), filed by Dana Setters, Craig Setters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form) (Maus, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Setters et al v. The Medical Protective Company Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Setters
Represented By: James F. Maus
Represented By: Alexander John Petraglia
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Setters
Represented By: James F. Maus
Represented By: Alexander John Petraglia
Represented By: Robert Albert Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Medical Protective Company Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Alan Harrison
Represented By: Richard D Porotsky, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medpro Group, Inc. f/k/a Medical Protecive Corporation, an Indiana Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medpro Group, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Alan Harrison
Represented By: Richard D Porotsky, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Protective Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Alan Harrison
Represented By: Richard D Porotsky, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?