JUUL Labs, Inc. v. Sharida et al
Plaintiff: JUUL Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Ismail Sharida, Wael Sharaydeh, Norwood 4411 Inc., Lila Wireless & Smoke Shop Inc., Middletown Discounts Inc., VIP Wireless & Tobacco Inc., VP Smoke & Connection Inc., Delhi Discounts Inc., Springfield Wireless & Smoke Inc., VIP Smoke and Mobile Inc. and Hamilton Wireless & Smoke Shop Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00490
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: The parties Rule 26f Meeting Report due to be filed by 10/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 9/22/2021. (art)
September 21, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Leis Gay for Defendants Delhi Discounts Inc., Hamilton Wireless & Smoke Shop Inc., Lila Wireless & Smoke Shop Inc., Middletown Discounts Inc., Norwood 4411 Inc., Wael Sharaydeh, Ismail Sharida, Springfield Wireless & Smoke Inc., VIP Smoke and Mobile Inc., VIP Wireless & Tobacco Inc., VP Smoke & Connection Inc. (Gay, Michael)
September 21, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, filed by All Defendants. (Gay, Michael)
September 13, 2021 Reset Deadlines re doc. #11 : Delhi Discounts Inc. answer due 9/22/2021; Hamilton Wireless & Smoke Shop Inc. answer due 9/22/2021; Lila Wireless & Smoke Shop Inc. answer due 9/22/2021; Middletown Discounts Inc. answer due 9/22/2021; Norwood 4411 Inc. answer due 9/22/2021; Wael Sharaydeh answer due 9/22/2021; Ismail Sharida answer due 9/22/2021; Springfield Wireless & Smoke Inc. answer due 9/22/2021; VIP Smoke and Mobile Inc. answer due 9/22/2021; VIP Wireless & Tobacco Inc. answer due 9/22/2021; VP Smoke & Connection Inc. answer due 9/22/2021. (eh)
September 10, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION by Plaintiff, Defendants. (Gay, Michael) Modified to include all filers on 9/13/2021 (eh).
August 11, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Not Effectuated related to COVID19) as to Defendant VIP Smoke and Mobile Inc. VIP Smoke and Mobile Inc. served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (kh)
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Hamilton Wireless & Smoke Shop Inc., VIP Wireless & Tobacco Inc.. Hamilton Wireless & Smoke Shop Inc. served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021; VIP Wireless & Tobacco Inc. served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (bjc)
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Not Effectuated related to COVID19) as to Defendants Middletown Discounts Inc., VP Smoke & Connection Inc. Middletown Discounts Inc. served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021; VP Smoke & Connection Inc. served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (kh)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Mailing: Certified mailing of Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipts) (kh)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Delhi Discounts Inc., Hamilton Wireless & Smoke Shop Inc., Lila Wireless & Smoke Shop Inc., Middletown Discounts Inc., Norwood 4411 Inc., Wael Sharaydeh, Ismail Sharida, Springfield Wireless & Smoke Inc., VIP Smoke and Mobile Inc., VIP Wireless & Tobacco Inc., and VP Smoke & Connection Inc. (kh)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 7/27/21. (ba)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff JUUL Labs, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,, of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Pierre-Louis, Lloyd)
July 27, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs JUUL Labs, Inc., Altria Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc. for JUUL Labs, Inc... (Pierre-Louis, Lloyd)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT, FALSE DESIGNATION OF ORIGIN, UNFAIR COMPETITION, VIOLATION OF OHIO COMMON LAW, AND VIOLATION OF OHIO DECEPTIVE TRADE PRACTICES ACT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8419208), filed by JUUL Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JUUL Labs Tradmarks, #2 Exhibit Images of Product Purchases, #3 Exhibit Jan. 25 2021 Cease and Desist Correspondence, #4 Exhibit Images of Product Purchase, #5 Exhibit Images of Product Purchase, #6 Exhibit Images of Product Purchase, #7 Exhibit Images of Product Purchase, #8 Exhibit Images of Product Purchase, #9 Exhibit Images of Product Purchase, #10 Exhibit Images of Product Purchase, #11 Exhibit Images of Product Purchase, #12 Exhibit Images of Product Purchase) (Pierre-Louis, Lloyd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUUL Labs, Inc. v. Sharida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUUL Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Lloyd Pierre-Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ismail Sharida
Represented By: Michael Leis Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wael Sharaydeh
Represented By: Michael Leis Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norwood 4411 Inc.
Represented By: Michael Leis Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lila Wireless & Smoke Shop Inc.
Represented By: Michael Leis Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middletown Discounts Inc.
Represented By: Michael Leis Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIP Wireless & Tobacco Inc.
Represented By: Michael Leis Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VP Smoke & Connection Inc.
Represented By: Michael Leis Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delhi Discounts Inc.
Represented By: Michael Leis Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springfield Wireless & Smoke Inc.
Represented By: Michael Leis Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIP Smoke and Mobile Inc.
Represented By: Michael Leis Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Wireless & Smoke Shop Inc.
Represented By: Michael Leis Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?