Connor v. The Craig and Frances Lindner Center of Hope
Plaintiff: Kathryn Connor
Defendant: The Craig and Frances Lindner Center of Hope
Case Number: 1:2021cv00492
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by The Craig and Frances Lindner Center of Hope. (Schmidt, Carl)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant The Craig and Frances Lindner Center of Hope. The Craig and Frances Lindner Center of Hope served on 8/6/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (kl)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R Kaake for Defendant The Craig and Frances Lindner Center of Hope (Kaake, Andrew)
August 25, 2021 Reset Deadlines: The Craig and Frances Lindner Center of Hope answer due 9/15/21. (sct)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl John Schmidt, III for Defendant The Craig and Frances Lindner Center of Hope (Schmidt, Carl)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION Amended by Defendant The Craig and Frances Lindner Center of Hope. (Schmidt, Carl)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Twenty-One Day Extension to Respond to Complaint by Defendant The Craig and Frances Lindner Center of Hope. (Schmidt, Carl)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing: Certified mailing of Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (kh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2021: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (kh).
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Craig and Frances Lindner Center of Hope. (kl)
July 29, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kl)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Craig and Frances Lindner Center of Hope ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8423356), filed by Kathryn Connor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Lalak, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connor v. The Craig and Frances Lindner Center of Hope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Connor
Represented By: Christopher James Lalak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Craig and Frances Lindner Center of Hope
Represented By: Andrew R Kaake
Represented By: Carl John Schmidt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?