The William Powell Company v. The Ocean Marine Insurance Company Limited et al
Plaintiff: The William Powell Company
Defendant: The Ocean Marine Insurance Company Limited, Aviva PLC, Aviva Insurance Limited, JOHN 1-10 DOE, United States Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York and Great American E&S Insurance Company, State Auto Mutual Insurance Company, John Does 1-10, Great American Insurance Company of New York and Great American E&S Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00522
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Great American E&S Insurance Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Harrison, Gregory)
October 14, 2021 Filing 29 Defendants Great American Insurance Co. of New York and Great American E&S Insurance Co.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against Aviva Insurance Limited, Aviva PLC, John Does 1-10, The Ocean Marine Insurance Company Limited filed by Great American Insurance Company of New York, Great American E&S Insurance Company. (Harrison, Gregory)
October 14, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Alan Harrison for Defendants Great American E&S Insurance Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York (Harrison, Gregory)
October 14, 2021 Filing 27 Summons Issued as to State Auto Mutual Insurance Company. (eh)
October 13, 2021 Filing 26 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to State Automobile Mutual (Lampley, Nathaniel)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan M. Kinney; granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael P. Murphy; granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew T. Walsh as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsels are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 10/4/2021. (eh)
October 1, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8523582) of MATTHEW T. WALSH by Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company. (Greathouse, Larry)
October 1, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Craig Greathouse for Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company (Greathouse, Larry)
October 1, 2021 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Aviva Insurance Limited. (McLaughlin, John)
October 1, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant The Ocean Marine Insurance Company Limited. (McLaughlin, John)
October 1, 2021 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Aviva PLC. (McLaughlin, John)
October 1, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8523133) of Michael P. Murphy by Defendants Aviva Insurance Limited, Aviva PLC, The Ocean Marine Insurance Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion PHV) (McLaughlin, John)
October 1, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8523092) of Jonathan M. Kinney by Defendants Aviva Insurance Limited, Aviva PLC, The Ocean Marine Insurance Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McLaughlin, John)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: For good cause shown, Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #17 ), which is unopposed, is GRANTED. Defendants may have up to and including October 25, 2021 to file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 09/13/2021. (kaf)
September 9, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by John F McLaughlin for Defendants Aviva Insurance Limited, Aviva PLC, The Ocean Marine Insurance Company Limited. (McLaughlin, John) Modified to include additional represented party . (kl)
September 9, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 10/25/2021. by Defendants Aviva Insurance Limited, Aviva PLC., and The Ocean Marine Insurance Company Limited. (McLaughlin, John) Modified to include additional represented party on 9/9/2021 (kl).
August 25, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to United States Fire Insurance Company on 8/16/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Brunner, Joseph)
August 25, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Great American E&S Insurance Company on 8/16/2021, answer due 10/15/2021; Great American Insurance Company of New York on 8/16/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (Brunner, Joseph)
August 25, 2021 Notice of Correction re [FORMER DOC 14]: Filed in error; attorney will re-file. (kh)
August 24, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Aviva Insurance Limited. Aviva Insurance Limited served on 8/20/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Brunner, Joseph)
August 24, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Aviva PLC. Aviva PLC served on 8/20/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Brunner, Joseph)
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant The Ocean Marine Insurance Company Limited. The Ocean Marine Insurance Company Limited served on 8/20/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Brunner, Joseph)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company on 8/16/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (Brunner, Joseph)
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Aviva Insurance Limited, Aviva PLC, The Ocean Marine Insurance Company Limited. (eh)
August 17, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Aviva Insurance Limited (Lampley, Nathaniel)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Aviva PLC (Lampley, Nathaniel)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. The Ocean Marine Insurance Company Limited (Lampley, Nathaniel)
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff The William Powell Company. (Lampley, Nathaniel)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David Frederick Hine for Plaintiff The William Powell Company (Hine, David)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Michael Brunner for Plaintiff The William Powell Company (Brunner, Joseph)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Lampley, Jr for Plaintiff The William Powell Company (Lampley, Nathaniel)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Aviva Insurance Limited, Aviva PLC, JOHN 1-10 DOE, Great American Insurance Company of New York and Great American E&S Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, State Auto Mutual Insurance Company, The Ocean Marine Insurance Company Limited, United States Fire Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8452599), filed by The William Powell Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lampley, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The William Powell Company v. The Ocean Marine Insurance Company Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The William Powell Company
Represented By: Joseph Michael Brunner
Represented By: David Frederick Hine
Represented By: Nathaniel Lampley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ocean Marine Insurance Company Limited
Represented By: John F McLaughlin
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Kinney
Represented By: Michael Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviva PLC
Represented By: John F McLaughlin
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Kinney
Represented By: Michael Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviva Insurance Limited
Represented By: John F McLaughlin
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Kinney
Represented By: Michael Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN 1-10 DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Larry Craig Greathouse
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company of New York and Great American E&S Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Auto Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Gregory Alan Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American E&S Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory Alan Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?