Williams v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Ruth Ann Williams
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America, CSCH and CHCS Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00595
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss: Defendant The Prudential Company of America's Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Messner, Lisa) Modified to create relationship to doc. 9, amended complaint on 11/3/2021 (kl).
November 2, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint of CHCS Services, Inc. filed by CHCS Service, Inc.. (Garinger, Paul)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Roben S. West as Co-Counsel (amended at doc. #15 ). Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/1/2021. (eh)
October 29, 2021 Filing 15 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8555519) of Roben S. West by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Messner, Lisa)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Enrique D. Arana as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 10/25/2021. (eh)
October 25, 2021 Notice of Deficiency re: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Roben S. West. The submitted certificate is not from the highest court of a State. Deficiency Deadline by 11/8/2021. (eh)
October 22, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8555539) of Enrique D. Arana by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Messner, Lisa)
October 22, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8555519) of Roben S. West by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Messner, Lisa)
October 20, 2021 Reset Deadlines per doc #12 : The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer due 11/2/2021. (kh)
October 19, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America to Move or Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Messner, Lisa)
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 [FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD] STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America to Move or Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Messner, Lisa) Modified Docket Text and Security on 10/19/2021 (bjc).
October 19, 2021 Notice of Correction re: #11 Stipulation, the document was missing a signature from the other side's counsel, the filer has been contacted and is to re-file the document with both signatures included on the document itself. (bjc)
October 15, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant CHCS Services, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant CHCS Service, Inc.. (Garinger, Paul)
October 15, 2021 Set Deadlines: CHCS Service, Inc. answer due 11/2/2021 per Doc. #10 . (bjc)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Ruth Ann Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Prudential Policy) (Perez, Robert)
October 5, 2021 Notice of Correction re [FORMER DOC.8]- Doc. 8 was restricted at filer's request for improper party identified in docket text. Doc. 9 was immediately filed by attorney to correct the error. (kl)
September 23, 2021 Reset Deadline re doc. #7 : The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer due 10/15/2021. (kl)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA TO MOVE OR PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Messner, Lisa)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Prudential Financial, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America.. (Messner, Lisa)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Prudential Financial Inc. dba The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial Inc. dba The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America for The Prudential Insurance Company of America.. (MacMurray, Helen)
September 21, 2021 Reset Deadlines per doc #4 : CHCS Service, Inc. answer due 10/15/2021. (kh)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant CHCS Service, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant CHCS Service, Inc.. (Garinger, Paul)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul N Garinger for Defendant CHCS Service, Inc. (Garinger, Paul)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 8/9/2021 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A2102740) by Ruth Ann Williams against CHCS Service, Inc., The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (eh)
September 20, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Common Pleas, case number A 2102740 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8502863), filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet) (Messner, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Ann Williams
Represented By: Robert Armand Perez, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Lisa Messner
Represented By: Enrique Daniel Arana
Represented By: Roben S. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHCS Service, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Adam Bartolozzi
Represented By: Paul N Garinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?