Key v. Tire Discounters, Inc
Plaintiff: Franklin Key
Defendant: Tire Discounters, Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv00619
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc. (Stephens, Stephen)
October 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen P Lewis for Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc (Lewis, Colleen)
October 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Hilliard for Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc (Hilliard, Jason)
October 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Joseph Stephens, III for Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc (Stephens, Stephen)
October 25, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Stephens, Stephen)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Tire Discounters, Inc. Tire Discounters, Inc served on 10/7/2021, answer due 10/28/2021. (bjc)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 1:21-cv-617, 1:21-cv-618, 1:21-cv-616, 1:21-cv-620, 1:21-cv-621, 1:21-cv-627, 1:21-cv-628, 1:21-cv-629, 1:21-cv-630, 1:21-cv-631, 1:21-cv-632, 1:21-cv-633, and 1:21-cv-634 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Matthew W. McFarland for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 10/07/2021. (bjc)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #1 Complaint and #4 Summons Issued. (eh)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tire Discounters, Inc. (eh)
September 30, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Franklin Key of Related Case (Legando, Drew)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Tire Discounters, Inc ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8516045), filed by Franklin T. Key. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Legando, Drew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Key v. Tire Discounters, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Key
Represented By: Drew T. Legando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tire Discounters, Inc
Represented By: Colleen P Lewis
Represented By: Jason Hilliard
Represented By: Stephen Joseph Stephens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?