Howard v. Bishoff
Plaintiff: Sasha Howard
Defendant: E V Bishoff and E V Bishoff Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00708
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Susan J Dlott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: (1) Within 30 days of this Order, Plaintiff shall sign her construed amended complaint form #2 or alternatively, shall submit a new complaint form that is properly signed; (2) Within 30 days of this Order, Plaintiff also shall pay the full filing fee or submit a fully completed application and affidavit to proceed in forma pauperis. This case may not further proceed until the appropriate filing fee is paid or Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (3) If Plaintiff fails to comply with either paragraphs 1 or 2 of this Order, by failing to submit a properly signed complaint form and to pay the filing fee or to submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis within the time limit specified above, the complaint may be dismissed. The Clerk of Court of the United States District Court is DIRECTED to submit an Application and Affidavit to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees form to Plaintiff. Response to Order due by 2/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 1/7/2022. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Sasha Howard against E V Bishoff, E V Bishoff Company . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kh) Modified docket text on 11/16/2021 (eh).
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against E V Bishoff, filed by Sasha Howard )No filing fee submitted). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Envelope) (bjc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Bishoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sasha Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E V Bishoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E V Bishoff Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?