Blair v. Hamilton County Detention Center Jail Facility
Plaintiff: Delfon Blair, r
Defendant: Hamilton County Detention Center Jail Facility
Case Number: 1:2022cv00005
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Appeal Counsel or Attorney by Plaintiff Delfon Blair, r. (bjc)
February 23, 2022 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Delfon Blair, r. (bjc)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 Complaint filed by Delfon Blair. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT: (1) The plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B); (2) The Court certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) that an appeal of any Order adopting this Report and Recommendation would not be taken in good faith and therefore deny plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Plaintiff remains free to apply to proceed in forma pauperis in the Court of Appeals. Objections to R&R due by 2/22/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 2/7/2022. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Hamilton County Detention Center Jail Facility, filed by Delfon Blair, r. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (km)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 2/7/2022. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Delfon Blair, r (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Summons, USM-285 Forms, Copies of the Complaint). (Attachments: #1 Habeas Corpus Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blair v. Hamilton County Detention Center Jail Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delfon Blair, r
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County Detention Center Jail Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?