Abbot v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: JOSHUA R. ABBOTT
Defendant: NORFOLK & SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, INC. and Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00071
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Railway Labor Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc.. (Brockman, James)
March 7, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Rabourn, Dexter)
March 7, 2022 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #2 Waiver of Service Executed, and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #2 Waiver of Service Executed as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 3/8/2022. (kh)
March 6, 2022 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to All Defendants. (Rabourn, Dexter)
February 10, 2022 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh)
February 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against NORFOLK & SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8716138), filed by JOSHUA R. ABBOTT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rabourn, Dexter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2022: #3 (Civil Cover Sheet re-sent by counsel at request of the Court for pdf error).) (eh). Modified to replace Attachment 3 with searchable pdf on 2/10/2022 (eh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbot v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA R. ABBOTT
Represented By: Dexter Arthur Rabourn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK & SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Inc.
Represented By: James Foley Brockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?