Cavalier Distributing Company, Inc. v. Lime Ventures, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cavalier Distributing Company, Inc.
Defendant: Lime Ventures, Inc., Brouwerij 3 Fonteinen, De La Senne, John Doe 1-3 and ABC Entities
Case Number: 1:2022cv00121
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Douglas R. Cole: Motion Hearing held on 4/25/22 re #5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Michael Mahon and Rick Weil appeared for the Plaintiff; Ryan Donovan and Kimberly Weber Herlihy appeared for Defendant Lime Ventures, Inc. The Court heard arguments of counsel and testimony of Michael Lucas and Benjamin Eberly. Plaintiff's exhibits 1 and 4 and Defendant's exhibits 3, 4, and 7 admitted. Matter taken under submission. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Sue Lopreato-Official). (sct)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Lime Ventures, Inc.. (Herlihy, Kimberly)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Lime Ventures, Inc.. (Herlihy, Kimberly)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE by Plaintiff Cavalier Distributing Company, Inc. to Take Deposition of Michael Lucas (Mahon, Michael)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 4/18/22. (sct)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Cavalier Distributing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Registration Certificate, #2 Exhibit B - Newsletter, #3 Exhibit C - 2020 Purchase Orders) (Mahon, Michael)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STATUS REPORT Proposed Stipulated Protective Order by Defendant Lime Ventures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Donovan, Ryan)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #20 Status Report, and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #20 as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 4/18/2022. (eh)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STATUS REPORT Proposed Stipulated Protective Order by Defendant Lime Ventures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Donovan, Ryan)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing re 4/11/2022 Telephone Conference by Defendant Brouwerij 3 Fonteinen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cassidy, Mary) Modified docket text on 4/13/2022 (eh).
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER denying as moot #9 Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 4/11/22. (sct)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Douglas R. Cole: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/11/22. Michael Mahon and Shana DeMooy appeared for Plaintiff; Ryan Donovan and Kimberly Weber Herlihy appeared for Defendant Lime Ventures, Inc.; Bonnie Pollock and Sue Cassidy appeared for Defendant Brouwerij 3 Fonteinen; Defendant De La Senne did not appear. The specific discovery needed for the upcoming preliminary injunction hearing was discussed. Plaintiff and Defendant Lime Ventures, Inc. agreed to exchange written discovery on certain identified topics by the end of the week. They further agreed to one potential deposition each, limited to no more than 3 hours. The Court advised the parties that it would not require Defendant Brouwerij 3 Fonteinen to participate in the upcoming hearing as it has yet to be served with the complaint in this matter. (sct)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , re #16 Response in Opposition filed by Defendant Lime Ventures, Inc.. (Donovan, Ryan) Modified docket relationships on 4/11/2022 (kl).
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #16 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Lime Ventures, Inc., and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #16 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Lime Ventures, Inc. as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 4/11/2022. (kl)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Lime Ventures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Donovan, Ryan)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Brouwerij 3 Fonteinen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Cassidy, Mary)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Lime Ventures, Inc.. (DeMooy, Shana)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Lime Ventures, Inc. Lime Ventures, Inc. served on 3/31/2022, answer due 4/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 USPS Tracking) (kh)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Suzanne Cassidy for Defendant Brouwerij 3 Fonteinen (Cassidy, Mary)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Jay O'Hara for Defendant Brouwerij 3 Fonteinen (O'Hara, Michael)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bonnie Pollack as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless she has done so previously. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 4/4/2022. (eh)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8803941) of Bonnie Pollack by Defendant Brouwerij 3 Fonteinen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cassidy, Mary)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Cavalier Distributing Company, Inc.. (DeMooy, Shana)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ryan T. Donovan as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 3/29/2022. (eh)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8794381) of Ryan T. Donovan by Defendant Lime Ventures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Mundy, Kara)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara Marie Mundy for Defendant Lime Ventures, Inc. (Mundy, Kara)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Mailing: Certified mailing of Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (kh)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry and Notation Order: Informal Preliminary Conference by telephone re #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction held before Judge Douglas R. Cole on 3/25/22. Michael Mahon and Shana DeMooy appeared for Plaintiff; Ryan Donovan appeared for Defendant Lime Ventures, Inc.; Bonnie Pollock appeared for Defendant Brouwerij 3 Fonteinen; Defendant De La Senne did not appear. The Court denies #5 Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order for reasons stated on the record. Hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 4/25/22 and 4/26/22 to begin at 9:30 a.m. Defendants shall file their response in opposition to the motion by 4/8/22. Plaintiff shall file their reply in support of the motion by 4/15/22. SO ORDERED. (sct)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Cavalier Distributing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Plaintiff's Counsel) (DeMooy, Shana). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 3/22/2022 (kl).
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael M. Mahon for Plaintiff Cavalier Distributing Company, Inc. (Mahon, Michael)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Shana DeMooy for Plaintiff Cavalier Distributing Company, Inc. (DeMooy, Shana)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brouwerij 3 Fonteinen, De La Senne, Lime Ventures, Inc.. (kl)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against Cavalier Distributing Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8753680), filed by Cavalier Distributing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form) (Kraft, Mary)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavalier Distributing Company, Inc. v. Lime Ventures, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cavalier Distributing Company, Inc.
Represented By: D Patrick Kasson
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Kraft
Represented By: Michael M. Mahon
Represented By: Shana DeMooy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lime Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Kara Marie Mundy
Represented By: Kimberly Weber Herlihy
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brouwerij 3 Fonteinen
Represented By: Mary Suzanne Cassidy
Represented By: Michael Jay O'Hara
Represented By: Bonnie L. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De La Senne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Entities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?