Freeman v. Spoljaric
Plaintiff: Wendell Kent Freeman
Defendant: Jonathan Spoljaric and Lawrence County
Case Number: 1:2022cv00203
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Douglas R Cole
Referring Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike #11 Amended Complaint by Defendants Lawrence County, Jonathan Spoljaric. (Sark, Cassaundra)
June 10, 2022 Filing 12 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Lawrence County, Jonathan Spoljaric. (Sark, Cassaundra)
June 6, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lawrence County, Jonathan Spoljaric, filed by Wendell Kent Freeman. (kl)
June 6, 2022 USB Drive, marked as Exhibit I, submitted to the Clerk's Office with Doc. #11 Amended Complaint and forwarded to the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kl)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: The parties must comply with the above mandates of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and file the Rule 26(f) Report of the Parties by June 13, 2022. The Court will thereafter, pursuant to Rule 16(b), enter a Calendar Order or will set and hold a Scheduling Conference after which a Calendar Order will be issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 5/12/2022. (kl)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 12, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF UPON FILING BY DEFENDANT(S) OF MOTION TO DISMISS re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS. (kl)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 11, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Sark, Cassaundra)
May 11, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Lawrence County, Jonathan Spoljaric. (Sark, Cassaundra)
April 28, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Lee Lambert for Defendants Lawrence County, Jonathan Spoljaric (Lambert, Randall)
April 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassaundra L. Sark for Defendants Lawrence County, Jonathan Spoljaric (Sark, Cassaundra)
April 13, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lawrence County, Jonathan Spoljaric. (kl)
April 13, 2022 Filing 3 Filing Fee Received: $ 402.00, receipt number 100CIN044115. (kl) Modified date filed on 4/14/2022 (kl).
April 13, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Plaintiff Wendell Kent Freeman- USB Drive Exhibit re #1 Complaint submitted to the Clerk's Office and forwarded to the chambers of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kl)
April 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Lawrence County, Jonathan Spoljaric, filed by Wendell Kent Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (kl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Spoljaric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Kent Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Spoljaric
Represented By: Randall Lee Lambert
Represented By: Cassaundra L. Sark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence County
Represented By: Randall Lee Lambert
Represented By: Cassaundra L. Sark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?