Griffin v. Siemens Industry, Inc.
Plaintiff: Willie Griffin
Defendant: Siemens Industry, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00270
Filed: May 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Black
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Siemens Industry, Inc.. (Newcomb, Angelique)
June 24, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Siemens Industry, Inc. (eh)
June 23, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE by Plaintiff Willie Griffin re #5 Summons Returned Executed Searchable (Reul, George)
June 22, 2022 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #5 Summons Returned Executed, and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #5 Summons Returned Executed as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 6/23/2022. (kh)
June 22, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Defendant Siemens Industry, Inc.. Siemens Industry, Inc. served on 5/19/2022, answer due 6/9/2022. (Reul, George) Modified Docket Text on 6/24/2022 (bjc).
June 21, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Reul, George)
June 21, 2022 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Siemens Industry, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Willie Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Receipt) (Reul, George)
May 19, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Willie Griffin re #1 Complaint (Reul, George)
May 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Siemens Industry, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8871267), filed by Willie Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Reul, George)
May 19, 2022 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Siemens Industry, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Griffin
Represented By: George M Reul, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Industry, Inc.
Represented By: Angelique Paul Newcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?