Jones v. Ohio State Patrol et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Jones
Defendant: Ohio State Patrol, CVG Airport Police Department and Cincinnati Highway Patrol Post 31
Case Number: 1:2023cv00794
Filed: December 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Karen L Litkovitz
Referring Judge: Matthew W McFarland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Matthew Jones. (eh)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED THAT: (1) The complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). (2) Plaintiff be warned that future meritless or frivolous case filings may result in the imposition of sanctions or filing injunctions. (2) The Court certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) that for the foregoing reasons an appeal of any Order adopting this Report and Recommendation would not be taken in good faith and therefore deny plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 1/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/23/2023. (zmc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 27, 2023 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against CVG Airport Police Department, Cincinnati Highway Patrol Post 31, Ohio State Patrol, filed by Matthew Jones. (zmc)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 12/23/2023. (zmc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 5, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Matthew Jones. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Ohio State Patrol et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio State Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVG Airport Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Highway Patrol Post 31
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?