Rudduck et al v. City of Wilmington et al
Plaintiff: Brett W. Rudduck and Amanda N. Rudduck
Defendant: City of Wilmington, Scott E. Baker, Ronald Cravens, John M. Stanforth, Jane Tuke-Johns and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2024cv00012
Filed: January 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Barrett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2024 NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/13/2024. Please visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of the Court's required Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures. (kkz)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER allowing Defendant Tuke-Johns to withdraw the #6 motion for judgment on the pleadings and DENYING as moot the #12 motion to strike filed by Plaintiffs Brett and Amanda Rudduck. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/5/2024. (kkz)
February 2, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Defendant Jane Tuke-Johns re #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Miller-Novak, Matthew)
January 26, 2024 Notice of Correction: Please note that docs. #11 and #12 are identical pleadings filed twice, at the request of the Clerk, to capture both the Response and Motion in ECF. (eh)
January 25, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Plaintiffs Amanda N. Rudduck, Brett W. Rudduck. (Chappars, Timothy)
January 24, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Plaintiffs Amanda N. Rudduck, Brett W. Rudduck. (Chappars, Timothy) Modified docket text on 1/25/2024 (eh).
January 15, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by City of Wilmington, John M. Stanforth. (Frick, Dawn)
January 15, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Marie Deaton for Defendants City of Wilmington, John M. Stanforth (Deaton, Susan)
January 15, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn M Frick for Defendants City of Wilmington, John M. Stanforth (Frick, Dawn)
January 15, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Scott E. Baker, Ronald Cravens. (Justice, Tabitha)
January 9, 2024 Filing 6 [WITHDRAWN per #14 Order] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant Jane Tuke-Johns. (Miller-Novak, Matthew) Modified on 2/5/2024 (kkz).
January 9, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, filed by Jane Tuke-Johns. (Miller-Novak, Matthew)
January 9, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E. Miller-Novak for Defendant Jane Tuke-Johns (Miller-Novak, Matthew)
January 8, 2024 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Scott E. Baker, City of Wilmington, Ronald Cravens, John Doe, John M. Stanforth, and Jane Tuke-Johns, originally filed on 12/6/2023 in Clinton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. CVH20230389) by Brett W. Rudduck and Amanda N. Rudduck. (zmc)
January 8, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE by Defendant City of Wilmington re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Frick, Dawn)
January 8, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clinton County Court of Common Pleas, case number cvh20230389 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9756348), filed by City of Wilmington. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Complaint, #3 Verification of Service, #4 Entry of Recusal) (Frick, Dawn)
January 8, 2024 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (zmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rudduck et al v. City of Wilmington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett W. Rudduck
Represented By: Timothy Stephen Chappars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda N. Rudduck
Represented By: Timothy Stephen Chappars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Wilmington
Represented By: Susan Marie Deaton
Represented By: Dawn M Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott E. Baker
Represented By: Nicholas Edward Subashi
Represented By: Tabitha Dee Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Cravens
Represented By: Nicholas Edward Subashi
Represented By: Tabitha Dee Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Stanforth
Represented By: Susan Marie Deaton
Represented By: Dawn M Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Tuke-Johns
Represented By: Matthew E. Miller-Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?