Lahti v. Consensys, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Lahti
Defendant: Consensys, Inc. and Alphabet, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00183
Filed: April 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Stephanie K Bowman
Referring Judge: Jeffery P Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE by Defendant Alphabet, Inc. re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Osterlund, Anthony)
May 20, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Alphabet, Inc.. (Osterlund, Anthony)
May 16, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE by Defendant Consensys, Inc. of Filing of Motion to Dismiss (Kemp, Matthew)
May 16, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss (Or in the Alternative, Stay) and Compel Arbitration by Defendant Consensys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alex Herman, #2 Exhibit 1 - Terms of Use, #3 Exhibit 2 - MetaMask Onboarding Screen) (Kemp, Matthew). Added MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Compel on 5/20/2024 (eh).
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David Moosmann; granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory N. Wolfe; granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory N. Tibor L. Nagy, Jr. as Co-Counsels. Co-Counsels are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 05/16/2024. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 15, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9973324) of Tibor L. Nagy, Jr. by Defendant Consensys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Kemp, Matthew)
May 15, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9973305) of Gregory N. Wolfe by Defendant Consensys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Kemp, Matthew)
May 15, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9973275) of David Moosmann by Defendant Consensys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Kemp, Matthew)
April 26, 2024 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Alphabet, Inc.. (Shadley, Alexander)
April 26, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint New date requested 5/20/2024. by Defendant Alphabet, Inc.. (Shadley, Alexander)
April 26, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Xavier Shadley for Defendant Alphabet, Inc. (Shadley, Alexander)
April 26, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony L Osterlund for Defendant Alphabet, Inc. (Osterlund, Anthony)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER - This matter is before the Court on Defendant Alphabet, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint (doc. #10 ). As with the previous motion for extension of time filed by Defendant Consensys, Inc., the Court notes that this is the Defendant's first requested extension and that Defendant complied with S. D. Ohio Civ. R. 7.3(a) prior to filing the instant motion in an attempt to obtain Plaintiff's consent to the requested extension. Having reviewed this matter, the Court finds Defendant's motion well taken. Accordingly, Defendant's motion (doc. #10 ) is GRANTED and Defendant Alphabet, Inc. shall have an extension of time through and including 5/20/2024 in which to answer, move or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 4/26/2024. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 22, 2024 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Consensys, Inc.. (Kemp, Matthew)
April 22, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint New date requested 5/16/2024. by Defendant Consensys, Inc.. (Kemp, Matthew)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER - This matter is before the Court on Defendant Consensys, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint (doc. #6 ). The Court notes that this is the Defendant's first requested extension and that Defendant complied with S. D. Ohio Civ. R. 7.3(a) prior to filing the instant motion in an attempt to obtain Plaintiff's consent to the requested extension. Having reviewed this matter, the Court finds Defendant's motion well taken. Accordingly, Defendant's motion (doc. #6 ) is GRANTED and Defendant Consensys, Inc. shall have an extension of time through and including 5/16/2024 in which to answer, move or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 4/22/2024. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 18, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Alphabet, Inc. Alphabet, Inc. served on 4/8/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. (kev)
April 4, 2024 Filing 4 Certificate of Mailing: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (bjc)
April 2, 2024 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 100003703. (kh)
April 2, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alphabet, Inc., Consensys, Inc. (kh)
April 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Alphabet, Inc., Consensys, Inc., filed by Sarah Lahti. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt) (kh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lahti v. Consensys, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Lahti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consensys, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Represented By: David Moosmann
Represented By: Gregory Nathaniel Wolfe
Represented By: Tibor L. Nagy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony L Osterlund
Represented By: Alexander Xavier Shadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?