SEC v. Thorn, et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Global Investors Group LLC, First Financial Ventures LLC, Second Financial Ventures LLC, Third Financial Ventures LLC, Frederick D Harris, International Trading Partners, LTD, Roger Weizenegger, Maconell SA, RLS International Investors, LLC, Durietha Dziorney, Blue Chip Investments LLC, Leon Heard, Alice's International Spa and Salon, Option One Mortgage Corporation and Frau-Erika Obrist
Movant: Carl E Jackson, Redmill Holdings LLC, Kimberly A Hockenhull Edwards, Clyde Hovick, Richard Hovick, Albert Obrist, C William Brownfield and Frau-Erika Obrist
Receiver: O'Grady
Counter_claimant: Frederick D Harris
Counter_defendant: Securities and Exchange Commission
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Frederick D Harris
Thirdparty_defendant: Bank One, Marc Hedlt, Keybank National Association, U S Bank NA, Merrill Lynch Co Inc and Securities and Exchange Commission
Claimant: Gloria F. Noland, Linda Kerr, Matt Abboushi, Dean R. Helberg, Michael E. Malizia, Randy Moore, Brenda Moore, John L Wagg, Kent S. Beilharz, The Patriot Foundation, Audrey J Dussard, Charlie Roscoe and First Choice Rehab
Intervenor_plaintiff: Charles F Freiburger, IV
Case Number: 2:2001cv00290
Filed: March 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
Presiding Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 OPINION AND ORDER denying 1014 Defendant Dziorney's Motion to Vacate or Set Aside Disgorgement Judgment. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 10/05/2011. (dh1)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 ORDER granting 1011 Motion of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission for an Order Concluding Receivership and Transferring Remaining Receivership Funds. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 05/24/2010. (dh)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 ORDER denying as moot 876 the motion filed by Frederick D. Harris on 04/23/07. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 03/19/2010. (dh)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 ORDER accepting the Final Report of Receiver 1003 and ordering the Receiver to make disbursements in accordance with the Final Report. The Court further grants 1002 the parties joint motion and vacates the judgment entered against Relief Defendants on October 14, 2003. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 12/10/09. (dh)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1006 ORDER granting 1005 Motion of Receiver, Michael P. O'Grady, for Approval of Expenses and Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 11/03/09. (dh)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 ORDER directing that any objections to the Final Report of the Receiver 1003 be filed on or before 11/30/09, or the Court will direct the Receiver to disburse the funds in accordance with the Final Report. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 10/27/09. (dh)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 ORDER granting 1000 Motion of Receiver, Michael P. O'Grady, for Approval of Expenses and Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 09/29/09. (dh)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 992 ORDER granting 991 Motion of Receiver, Michael P. O'Grady, for Approval of Expenses and Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 08/04/09. (dh)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 990 ORDER granting 989 Motion of Receiver, Michael P. O'Grady, for Approval of Expenses and Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 07/09/09. (dh)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 983 ORDER granting 982 Motion of Receiver, Michael P. O'Grady, for Approval of Expenses and Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 06/15/09. (dh)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 981 ORDER granting 979 Motion of Receiver, Michael P. O'Grady, for Approval of Expenses and Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 05/28/09. (dh) Modified on 5/29/2009 to correct docket-number order (aq1).
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 976 ORDER granting 975 Motion of Receiver, Michael P. O'Grady, for Approval of Expenses and Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 03/31/09. (dh)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 970 ORDER granting 969 Motion of Receiver, Michael P. O'Grady, for Approval of Expenses and Attorney Fees. Signed by Edmund A Sargus on 01/22/09. (dh)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 968 ORDER denying as moot 964 Motion to Intervene of Charlie Roscoe and First Choice Rehab. Signed by Edmund A Sargus on 01/08/09. (dh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEC v. Thorn, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: John E Birkenheier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Investors Group LLC
Represented By: C William Brownfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Financial Ventures LLC
Represented By: David Albert Kopech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Second Financial Ventures LLC
Represented By: David Albert Kopech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Third Financial Ventures LLC
Represented By: David Albert Kopech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick D Harris
Represented By: Karl E. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Trading Partners, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Weizenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maconell SA
Represented By: Linda Leah Reibel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RLS International Investors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durietha Dziorney
Represented By: Charles W. Brownfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Chip Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice's International Spa and Salon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Option One Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frau-Erika Obrist
Represented By: Benjamin R Ogletree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Carl E Jackson
Represented By: Karl E. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Redmill Holdings LLC
Represented By: Karl E. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Kimberly A Hockenhull Edwards
Represented By: Mary Jane McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Clyde Hovick
Represented By: David Albert Kopech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Richard Hovick
Represented By: David Albert Kopech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Albert Obrist
Represented By: Linda Leah Reibel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: C William Brownfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Frau-Erika Obrist
Represented By: Benjamin R Ogletree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: O'Grady
Represented By: Steven E Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Frederick D Harris
Represented By: Karl E. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: John E Birkenheier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Frederick D Harris
Represented By: Karl E. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Bank One
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Root
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Marc Hedlt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Keybank National Association
Represented By: Thomas Louis Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: U S Bank NA
Represented By: Pierre H Bergeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Merrill Lynch Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Dale Edward Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gloria F. Noland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Linda Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Matt Abboushi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dean R. Helberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael E. Malizia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Randy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brenda Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: John L Wagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kent S. Beilharz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: The Patriot Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Audrey J Dussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Charlie Roscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: First Choice Rehab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Charles F Freiburger, IV
Represented By: Percy Squire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?