Robb v. Ishee
Petitioner: Jason Robb
Respondent: Todd Ishee
Intervenor_plaintiff: James Were
Case Number: 2:2002cv00535
Filed: June 3, 2002
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: MAHONING
Presiding Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting 191 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 6/26/2017. (cw)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 OPINION AND ORDER Modifying Protective Order. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/26/2012. (cw)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER DIRECTING the clerk to notice all counsel in Were v. Bobby, Case No. 1:10-cv-698, as to the discovery conference scheduled for Thursday, 3/15/2012, at 2:00 p.m. All counsel who can attend in person shall do so. Counsel who cannot attend in person shall participate by telephone. The parties are DIRECTED to contact the Undersigned by Friday, March 2 to confirm the manner in which they will participate in the conference. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/29/2012. (cw)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER denying as moot 128 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting 130 Motion for Discovery. Petitioner SHALL HAVE no more than two (2) months from the date of this order to conduct the discovery identified herein. When the discovery allowed by this order has been completed, Petitioner SHALL FILE a notice indicating that the discovery hasbeen completed and/or any motion for additional discovery. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/24/2012. (cw)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Petitioner SHALL HAVE no more than two (2) months from the date of this order to conduct the discovery identified herein. When the discovery allowed by this order has been completed, Petitioner SHALL FILE a notice indicating that the discovery has been completed and/or any motion for additional discovery. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/12/2011. (cw)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 OPINION AND ORDER granting 120 and denying 123 Motion for a Status Conference. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 8/19/2011. (pes1)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting 107 Motion for Reconsideration. Respondent is DIRECTED TO PROVIDE to petitioners counsel, under the terms and conditions of the Courts December 29, 2005 Stipulation and Protective Order (Doc. # 57), all of the pages identified in th is Order. Parties are DIRECTED TO FILE, within forty-five (45) days of the date of this order, a joint report advising the Court as to the status of the discovery permitted by this Court and/or agreed to by respondent.. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 03/23/2009. (west1, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robb v. Ishee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Robb
Represented By: Lisa Babish Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Todd Ishee
Represented By: Stephen E. Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: James Were
Represented By: Randall Lee Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?