Jackson v. Bradshaw
Petitioner: Kareem Jackson
Respondent: Margaret Bradshaw
Case Number: 2:2003cv00983
Filed: October 23, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: RICHLAND
Presiding Judge: Gregory L Frost
Presiding Judge: Terence P Kemp
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 OPINION AND ORDER terminating as moot 113 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 114 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 5/8/2017. (agm)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER denying 97 Motion for Independent Relief ; denying 100 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 103 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Gregory L. Frost on 9/28/15. (kn)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER that Petitioner should be entitled to a writ vacating his death sentence unless the State of Ohio, within one hundred eighty (180) days from the date of an order providing for such relief, conducts a new mitigation hearing. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 12/16/10. (sem1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kareem Jackson
Represented By: Robert K Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Margaret Bradshaw
Represented By: Morgan Arnett Linn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?