Owner Operator Independent Drivers Association Inc et al v. Comerica Bank
Case Number: 2:2005cv00056
Filed: January 19, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
Presiding Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 11:101 Bankruptcy
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 155 FINAL JUDGMENT. Judgment entered for Plaintiffs, and AWARDING the Class restitution in the amount of $5,583,084.00. Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/20/2012. (cw)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER DENYING 145 Notice, Defendant Comerica's offer of proof and request that the Plaintiffs be required to prove damages filed by Comerica Bank. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/1/2011. (cw)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER SETTING POST-TRIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/1/2011. (cw)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER on Plaintiff's request for in camera inspection re 132 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/19/2011. (cw)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER CONTINUING BENCH TRIAL DATE AND TO COMPEL, (Bench Trial Resumes on 10/31/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Columbus before Judge Algenon L. Marbley.). Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 11/5/2011. (cw)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER finding as moot 128 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 129 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/3/2011. (cw)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER GRANTING in part 107 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Michael Wiese, Carl Harp, Owner Operator Independent Drivers Association Inc, ( Final Pretrial Conference reset for 9/30/2011 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Algenon L. Marbley, Jury Trial set for 10/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Columbus before Judge Algenon L. Marbley.). Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/20/2011. (cw)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER SETTING A TELEPHONIC Status Conference for 9/19/2011 10:30 AM before Judge Algenon L. Marbley. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/15/2011. (cw)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/12/2011. (cw)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER RESETTING BENCH TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND GRANTING 85 MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Comerica Bank, ( Bench Trial reset for 10/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Columbus before Judge Algenon L. Marbley, Final Pretrial Conference reset for 9/26/2011 10:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Algenon L. Marbley.). Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 08/30/2011. (cw)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Resetting Status Conference for 5/25/2011 at 03:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Algenon L. Marbley. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 05/13/2011. (cw)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 70 Motion to schedule a Status Conference. Status Conference is set for 5/26/2011 at 10:00 a.m. in chambers, before the Honorable Algenon L. Marbley. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 5/12/2011. (cw)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Opinion and Order signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 03/16/2009. (cw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owner Operator Independent Drivers Association Inc et al v. Comerica Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?