King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association et al v. J. Kenneth Blackwell et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs alleged that Defendants have conspired to deprive and continue to deprive Ohioans of their rights to vote by unfairly allocating election resources (e.g., voting machines), instituting a system of provisional ballots, purging voter registrations and breaking the bi-partisan chain of custody of ballots.

Plaintiff: King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal and Harvey Wasserman
Defendant: Jennifer L. Brunner, John Does 1-100, The Ohio Republican Party, Robert T. Bennett, Matthew M. Damschroder and Daniel Bare
Intervenor: State Of Ohio
Intervenor Plaintiff: The Ohio Election Justice Campaign, Paddy Shaffer, Marlys Barbee, Virginia Brooks, Marian Lupo, Mark Brown, Timothy Kettler, Bruce Duncanson and Peter Jones
Objector: Michael Connell
Case Number: 2:2006cv00745
Filed: August 31, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2011 Filing 118 BRIEF on Jurisdiction, Discovery and Evidence Issues Identified by the Court re 113 Order by Plaintiffs Willis Brown, Miles Curtiss, Paul Gregory, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, Matthew Segal & Harvey Wasserman. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Att 1 Architecture Map, # 2 Appendix Att 2 Connell Deposition, # 3 Appendix Att 3 GovTech Voter DB K, # 4 Appendix Att 4 GovTech Mirroring & Website, # 5 Appendix Att 5 SmarTech Proposed Map, # 6 Appendix Att 6 RFK Jr Evidence Summary) (Arnebeck, Clifford) Modified on 7/18/2011 to clarify text (kk2)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting 114 Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief; granting 115 Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief; granting 116 Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief. Defendants shall now have until August 5, 2011, in which to file the responsive brief, and Plaintiffs shall have until August 12, 2011, in which to file a reply. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 7/14/2011. (cw1)
July 12, 2011 Filing 116 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief as to Issues Identified by the Court by Plaintiffs Willis Brown, Miles Curtiss, Paul Gregory, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, Matthew Segal & Harvey Wasserman. New date requested 7/15/2011. (Arnebeck, Clifford) Modified on 7/13/2011 to correct text & filing event (kk2)
July 8, 2011 Filing 115 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 7/12/2011. by Plaintiffs Willis Brown, Miles Curtiss, Paul Gregory, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman. (Arnebeck, Clifford)
June 24, 2011 Filing 114 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief as to Issues Identified by the Court by Plaintiffs Willis Brown, Miles Curtiss, Paul Gregory, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, Matthew Segal & Harvey Wasserman. New date requested 7/8/2011. (Arnebeck, Clifford) Modified on 6/27/2011 to correct text & filing event (kk2)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Oral Request to depose Karl Rove. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file a brief by 6/24/11, Defendant's Memorandum Contra is due by 7/15/11 and Plaintiffs' Reply is due by 7/22/11. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 5/25/2011. (cw)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Setting a Status Conference re 110 Notice Opposing Any Discovery filed by Jennifer L. Brunner & State Of Ohio - Status Conference set for 5/25/2011 @ 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Algenon L. Marbley. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 05/12/2011. (cw)
February 25, 2011 Filing 111 RESPONSE to Motion re 110 MOTION for Status Conference filed by Plaintiffs Willis Brown, Miles Curtiss, Paul Gregory, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, Matthew Segal & Harvey Wasserman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1 Wash Post, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 2 NYT) (Arnebeck, Clifford) Modified on 2/28/2011 to add doc link (kk2)
February 8, 2011 MOTION for Status Conference by Defendant Jennifer L. Brunner.SEE DOCKET # 110 FOR DOCUMENT (kk2)
February 8, 2011 Filing 110 NOTICE Opposing Any Discovery and Request for Status Conference re 102 MOTION for Reconsideration re 101 Opinion and Order and Request for Emergency Hearing by Defendant Jennifer L. Brunner & Intervenor State Of Ohio (Coglianese, Richard) Modified on 2/9/2011 to clarify text (kk2)
January 19, 2011 Filing 109 NOTICE of Developments in the USDC NDOH re 102 MOTION for Reconsideration re 101 Opinion and Order and Request for Emergency Hearing by Plaintiffs Willis Brown, Miles Curtiss, Paul Gregory, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, Matthew Segal & Harvey Wasserman (Arnebeck, Clifford) Modified on 1/20/2011 to clarify text (kk2)
January 3, 2011 Filing 108 REPLY to Response to 102 MOTION for Reconsideration re 101 Opinion and Order and Request for Emergency Hearing filed by Plaintiffs Willis Brown, Miles Curtiss, Paul Gregory, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, Matthew Segal & Harvey Wasserman. (Arnebeck, Clifford)
January 3, 2011 Filing 107 REPLY to Response to 102 MOTION for Reconsideration re 101 Opinion and Order and Request for Emergency Hearing filed by Plaintiffs Willis Brown, Miles Curtiss, Paul Gregory, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, Matthew Segal & Harvey Wasserman. (Arnebeck, Clifford)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 105 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 102 MOTION for Reconsideration. Replies due by 1/3/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 12/29/10. (jcw)
December 28, 2010 Filing 105 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 102 MOTION for Reconsideration re 101 Opinion and Order and Request for Emergency Hearing by Plaintiffs Willis Brown, Miles Curtiss, Paul Gregory, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, Matthew Segal & Harvey Wasserman. New date requested 1/3/2011. (Arnebeck, Clifford) Modified on 12/29/2010 to correct doc link to mtn (kk2)
December 17, 2010 Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition re 102 MOTION for Reconsideration re 101 Opinion and Order and Request for Emergency Hearing filed by Defendant Jennifer L. Brunner & Intervenor State Of Ohio. (Coglianese, Richard)
December 17, 2010 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition re 102 MOTION for Reconsideration re 101 Opinion and Order and Request for Emergency Hearing filed by Movants Partnership for Ohio's Future, Linda Woggon, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Ohio Chamber of Commerce Education Foundation & Andrew Doehrel. (Smith, Bradley) Modified on 12/20/2010 to add filers (kk2)
December 3, 2010 Filing 102 MOTION for Reconsideration re 101 Opinion and Order and Request for Emergency Hearing by Plaintiffs Willis Brown, Miles Curtiss, Paul Gregory, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, Matthew Segal & Harvey Wasserman. (Arnebeck, Clifford) Modified on 12/6/2010 to correct text & add doc link to #101 (kk2)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 OPINION AND ORDER granting 92 Motion to Quash; denying 93 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 11/19/2010. (Kemp, Terence)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 97 Motion for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Support of 92 MOTION to Quash Subpoena - extended to 11/16/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 11/17/2010. (pes1)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 95 Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Memorandum to 92 MOTION to Quash Subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 11/16/2010. (pes1)
November 15, 2010 Filing 98 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re 92 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas to Produce Documents filed by Movants Partnership for Ohio's Future, Linda Woggon, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Ohio Chamber of Commerce Educational Foundation & Andrew Doehrel. (Smith, Bradley) Modified on 11/16/2010 to correct filers (kk2)
November 15, 2010 Filing 97 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Memorandum re 92 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Produce Documents by Movants Partnership for Ohio's Future, Linda Woggon, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Ohio Chamber of Commerce Educational Foundation & Andrew Doehrel. New date requested 11/16/2010. (Smith, Bradley) Modified on 11/16/2010 to correct text, filers, ECF filing event & add doc link to mtn to quash (kk2)
November 13, 2010 Filing 96 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re 92 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoenas filed by Plaintiffs Willis Brown, Miles Curtiss, Paul Gregory, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, Matthew Segal & Harvey Wasserman. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix OEC Complaint & Exhibits, # 2 Appendix OEC 11-1 Hearing Transcript, # 3 Appendix OEC Hearing Exhibits 1-5, # 4 Exhibit 1 Cit for Strg OH contributions, # 5 Exhibit 2 Ptr for OH's Future contibutors, # 6 Exhibit 3 Arnebeck to Smith Doc Hold Ltr, # 7 Exhibit 4 Rove on Face the Nation, # 8 Exhibit 5 Tobacco Coup of 1994, # 9 Exhibit 6 Coalition for Legal Reform, # 10 Exhibit 7 Analysis of Ltr to FBI on Connell death, # 11 Exhibit 8 Analysis of Connell crash site, # 12 Exhibit 9 Cyber Map of 2004 OH election, # 13 Exhibit 10 Cyber Map of 2006 OH election, # 14 Exhibit 11 Smartech targets Obama) (Arnebeck, Clifford)
November 13, 2010 Filing 95 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Memorandum Contra Out of Period re 92 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Plaintiffs Willis Brown, Miles Curtiss, Paul Gregory, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, Matthew Segal & Harvey Wasserman. New date requested 11/13/2010. (Arnebeck, Clifford) Modified on 11/15/2010 to correct text & add doc link to mtn (kk2)
November 9, 2010 Filing 94 NOTICE of Response to Plaintiffs' Attempt to Subpoena Karl Rove by Defendant Jennifer L. Brunner (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Arnebeck Email Dated October 25, 2010, # 2 Exhibit Arnebeck Email Dated October 31, 2010) (Coglianese, Richard) Modified on 11/10/2010 to correct text (kk2)
November 2, 2010 MOTION for Emergency Order to Compel the Immediate Production of the Requested Information by Plaintiffs Willis Brown, Miles Curtiss, Paul Gregory, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, Matthew Segal & Harvey Wasserman.SEE DOCKET # 93 FOR DOCUMENT. (kk2)
November 2, 2010 Filing 93 RESPONSE in Opposition re 92 MOTION to Quash and Request for Immediate Relief filed by Plaintiffs Willis Brown, Miles Curtiss, Paul Gregory, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, Matthew Segal & Harvey Wasserman. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Excerpt of Transcript) (Arnebeck, Clifford)
November 1, 2010 Filing 92 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects by Movants Andrew Doehrel, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Ohio Chamber of Commerce Educational Foundation, Linda Woggon & Partnership for Ohio's Future. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6) (pes1) Modified on 11/2/2010 to correct filers (kk2)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 OPINION AND ORDER denying 81 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/22/2009. (cw) Modified on 12/23/2009 to clarify text (kk2).
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Surreply re 81 MOTION for Reconsideration re 78 Opinion and Order filed by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman & King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5) (pes1) Modified on 5/28/2009 to correct text (kk2).
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 88 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 5/27/2009. (pes1)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman & King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment 1: Surreply, instanter, # 2 Exhibit 1: Arnebeck Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2: 2004 MAP, # 4 Exhibit 3: 2006 MAP, # 5 Exhibit 4: Spoonamore Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5: Kimberlin Declaration) (Arnebeck, Clifford)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REPLY to Response to 81 MOTION for Reconsideration re 78 Opinion and Order filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs The Ohio Election Justice Campaign, Paddy Shaffer, Marlys Barbee, Virginia Brooks, Marian Lupo, Mark Brown, Timothy Kettler, Bruce Duncanson & Peter Jones. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - DVD manually filed in the Clerk's Office, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K) (pes1) Modified on 5/11/2009 to clarify text (kk2).
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 RESPONSE in Opposition re 81 MOTION for Reconsideration re 78 Opinion and Order filed by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman & King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Clifford Arnebeck, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Miles Curtiss) (Arnebeck, Clifford) Modified on 4/27/2009 to clarify text (kk2).
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 84 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 81 MOTION for Reconsideration. Responses due by 4/24/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 4/21/2009. (pes1)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 81 MOTION for Reconsideration re 78 Opinion and Order by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman & King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Arnebeck, Clifford) Modified on 4/20/2009 to clarify text (kk2).
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying w/out prejudice # 82 Motion to Seal Document signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 3/31/2009 - (wh1)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION to Seal Exhibit E of 81 MOTION for Reconsideration by Intervenor Plaintiffs Paddy Shaffer, Marlys Barbee, Virginia Brooks, Marian Lupo, Mark Brown, Timothy Kettler, Bruce Duncanson, Peter Jones. (pes1)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION for Reconsideration re 78 Opinion and Order by Intervenor Plaintiffs Paddy Shaffer, Marlys Barbee, Virginia Brooks, Marian Lupo, Mark Brown, Timothy Kettler, Bruce Duncanson & Peter Jones. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (pes1) Modified on 3/25/2009 to clarify text (kk2).
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Letter from Marlys J. Barbee regarding 78 Opinion and Order. (pes1)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Submission of Dying Declaration by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman & King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of John Caylor) (Arnebeck, Clifford) Modified on 3/19/2009 to clarify text (kk2).
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying 36 Motion to Intervene; striking 37 Motion for criminal contempt; striking 70 Motion for expedited conference. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 03/05/2009. (cw, ) Modified on 3/6/2009 to clarify text (kk2).
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint, by Intervenor State Of Ohio. (pes1)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting # 11 Motion to Intervene by the State of Ohio. Signed by Terence P Kemp on 1/21/2009. (pes1)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 75 RESPONSE to Motion re 72 MOTION to Quash filed by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Minutes of Proceeding) (Arnebeck, Clifford)
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE by Objector Michael Connell of Filing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Ervin, James)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION to Strike 70 MOTION by Moving Intervenors for Expedited Hearing by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. Responses due by 11/7/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Check endorsed for payment) (Arnebeck, Clifford)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION to Quash by Objector Michael Connell. (Attachments: # 1 Errata A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Ervin, James)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RESPONSE to Motion re 69 MOTION to Quash filed by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Arnebeck, Clifford)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION for an Expedited Conference for Apparent Fraud Upon the Court by Intervenor Plaintiffs The Ohio Election Justice Campaign, Paddy Shaffer, Marlys Barbee, Virginia Brooks, Marian Lupo, Mark Brown, Timothy Kettler, Bruce Duncanson, Peter Jones. (pes)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION to Quash by Objector Michael Connell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Michael Connell) (Ervin, James)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Gilman Objector Michael Connell (Gilman, Jeremy)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by James Allen Jones, III Objector Michael Connell (Jones, James)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance (Ervin, James)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 AGREED ORDER signed by Terence P Kemp on 9/19/2008: The stay in this matter is lifted for the sole purpose of permitting the pltfs to take the deposition of Michael Connell and any other witnesses whose testimony, in the judgment of these parties, may be warranted based upon the depo of Michael Connell. (pes) Modified text on 9/23/2008 (er1 ).
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting # 63 - reply brief due 9/17/2008. Signed by Terence P Kemp on 9/19/2008. (pes)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Arnebeck, Clifford)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REPLY to 45 Response to 39 MOTION for Relief from Stay filed by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Stephen Spoonamore, # 2 Affidavit Richard Hayes Phillips) (Arnebeck, Clifford)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting # 59 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 39 MOTION for Relief from Stay. Replies due by 9/16/2008. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Terence P Kemp on 9/15/2008. (pes)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re 59 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Paddy Shaffer, Marlys Barbee, Virginia Brooks, Marian Lupo, Mark Brown, Timothy Kettler, Bruce Duncanson, Peter Jones. (pes1)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 39 Motion for Relief from Stay. New date requested 9/16/2008. by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Arnebeck, Clifford) Modified on 9/10/2008 to correct docket entry relationship. (pes1).
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 55 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 43 MOTION to Strike 37 . Replies due by 9/8/2008. Signed by Terence P Kemp on 9/10/2008. (pes)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re 43 MOTION to Strike 37 MOTION, 36 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Strike 37 MOTION, 36 MOTION to Intervene filed by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Clifford Arnebeck) (Arnebeck, Clifford)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting # 53 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re # 35 ; Replies due by 9/10/2008. Signed by Terence P Kemp on 9/8/2008. (pes1)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 9/8/2008. by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Arnebeck, Clifford)
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying # 51 Motion for Extension of Time does not comply with Local Civil Rule 7.3. Signed by Terence P Kemp on 9/4/2008. (pes)
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 9/10/2008. by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Arnebeck, Clifford)
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying # 50 - Motion does not comply with Local Civil Rule 7.3. Signed by Terence P Kemp on 9/4/2008. (pes) Modified on 9/4/2008 to link to correct motion.(pes).
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 9/5/2008. by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Arnebeck, Clifford)
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 9/8/2008. by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Arnebeck, Clifford)
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 39 MOTION for Relief from Stay; Replies due by 8/29/2008. Signed by Terence P Kemp on 8/27/2008. (pes)
August 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to # 39 Motion for Relief from Stay; New date requested 8/29/2008. by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Arnebeck, Clifford) Modified on 8/27/2008 to correct docket entry relationship (pes).
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 AMENDED Response in Opposition re: # 46 by Intervenor Plaintiffs Virginia Brooks, Marian Lupo, Mark Brown, Timothy Kettler, Bruce Duncanson, Peter Jones. Amendment to 46 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Reply Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Amended Reply Part 2) (pes)
August 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re 43 MOTION to Strike 37 MOTION, 36 MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Paddy Shaffer, Marlys Barbee, Virginia Brooks, Marian Lupo, Mark Brown, Timothy Kettler, Bruce Duncanson, Peter Jones. (pes)
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Response in Opposition to 39 Motion for Relief from Stay by Defendant Jennifer L. Brunner. (Coglianese, Richard) Modified text on 8/20/2008 (er1 ).
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPLY to 41 Response to 36 MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Paddy Shaffer, Marlys Barbee, Virginia Brooks, Marian Lupo, Mark Brown, Timothy Kettler, Bruce Duncanson, Peter Jones. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (pes1) Modified text and added link on 8/18/2008 (er1 ).
July 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION to Strike 37 MOTION, 36 MOTION to Intervene by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. Responses due by 8/25/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit Attachment B) (Arnebeck, Clifford)
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 MOTION For Criminal Contempt filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs The Ohio Election Justice Campaign, Paddy Shaffer, Marlys Barbee, Virginia Brooks, Marian Lupo, Mark Brown, Timothy Kettler, Bruce Duncanson, Peter Jones. (pes1)
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Intervene filed by Defendant Jennifer L. Brunner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Chin, Pearl)
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re 37 MOTION for criminal contemot and special grand jury filed by Defendant Jennifer L. Brunner. (Coglianese, Richard)
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STATUS REPORT & Motion for Relief from Stay by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman & King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Arnebeck, Clifford) Modified text and event on 8/20/2008 (er1 ).
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Affirmation of Appendix A and Exhibits in Support of # 37 by Intervenor Plaintiffs The Ohio Election Justice Campaign, Paddy Shaffer, Marlys Barbee, Virginia Brooks, Marian Lupo, Mark Brown, Timothy Kettler, Bruce Duncanson, Peter Jones. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit - Part 3) (pes)
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Intervenor-Plaintiffs Ohio Election Justice Campaign and Named Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. §§ 401-402 and 18 U.S.C. §§ 3331-3334 for Criminal Contempt and Special Grand Jury Proceedings. (Attachments: Exhibit A Volume 1-3 and Appendix A Volume 1-3 manually filed in the Clerk's Office) (pes)
July 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Intervenor-Plaintiffs Ohio Election Justice Campaign and Named Plaintiffs' Shaffer, Barbee, Brooks, Brown, Duncanson, Lupo, Jones, and Kettler Verified Motion to Intervene. (pes)
August 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 9/21/2007. Motion to Extend Stay to date of Status Conference with the Court by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Arnebeck, Clifford)
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER finding as moot 32 Motion to Stay; granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time. All proceedings are STAYED until 8/31/2007. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 8/15/2007. (cw, )
August 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 8/31/2007. Motion to further extend stay by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Arnebeck, Clifford)
June 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Stay all proceedings until August 10, 2007 by Defendants The Ohio Republican Party, Robert T. Bennett, Matthew M. Damschroder, Daniel Bare, J Kenneth Blackwell, Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, Intervenor State Of Ohio. (Coglianese, Richard) Modified on 6/11/2007 to correct filers (kk2).
April 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 29 Motion to Stay . Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on April 6, 2007. (bc1, )
April 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AGREED ORDER regarding disposition of all ballots from 2004 Presidential election. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on April 6, 2007. (bc1, )
April 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Stay all Proceedings until June 8, 2007 by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, Defendant J Kenneth Blackwell. (Sikora, Damian)
April 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Order Regarding Disposition of all Ballots from 2004 Presidential Election by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, Defendant J Kenneth Blackwell. (Sikora, Damian)
February 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS UNTIL 4/9/2007. This case is stayed until 4/9/2007. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/14/2007. (cw, )
February 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction - Former docket #25 (Response to Motion) filed by Robert Fitrakis deleted & re-filed as current docket # 25 (Response in Opposition to Motion) in order to correct ECF filing event and to correct docket number from 27 back to 25 after re-docketing occured. (kk2)
February 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition to 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint as Moot filed by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman & King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (kk2) Modified on 2/6/2007 to correct dkt # from 27 to 25 (kk2).
February 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Stay all proceedings until April 9, 2007 by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, Defendant J Kenneth Blackwell. (Coglianese, Richard)
February 5, 2007 Opinion or Order RESPONSE to Motion re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint as Moot, 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint as Moot New date requested 2/5/2007. Proposed Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Fitrakis, Robert) Modified on 2/6/2007 - document deleted & re-filed as current dkt #25 to correct filing event (kk2).
January 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE by Defendant J Kenneth Blackwell of Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter from Attorney General)(James, Larry)
December 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint as Moot. New date to respond 2/5/2007. Signed by Judge Terence P Kemp on 12/28/2006. (sr)
December 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint as Moot New date requested 2/5/2007. by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Arnebeck, Clifford)
December 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint as Moot by Defendant J Kenneth Blackwell. Responses due by 1/4/2007 (Corl, Christina)
November 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Subodh Chandra's admission pro hac vice to appear on behalf of Plaintiff in case no. 2:06-cv-896. Signed by Judge Terence P Kemp on 11/14/06. (kch) Modified on 11/15/2006 to correct text (kk1).
November 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re 17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Attachments: # 1 Declarations & Attachments 1# 2 Declarations & Attachments 2)(Arnebeck, Clifford)
November 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re 17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendant J Kenneth Blackwell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Judith Grady# 2 Exhibit B - Damschroder Affidavit)(Corl, Christina) Modified on 11/7/2006 to correct typo in text (kk1).
November 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support# 2 Text of Proposed Order # 3 # 4 # 5)(Arnebeck, Clifford)
October 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association Voluntary dismissal of defendat Sam Hogsett (Arnebeck, Clifford)
October 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER transferring C2-06-896 to Judge Algenon L. Marbley from Jugde Gregory L. Frost. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost and Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/26/06. (sem1, )
October 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE by Defendant J Kenneth Blackwell of Filing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Directive 2006-78# 2 Exhibit Summary of Election Laws by State)(Sikora, Damian)
October 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendant J Kenneth Blackwell.(Corl, Christina)
October 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to relate or consolidate cases by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit NE Ohio Complaint C2 06 896)(Arnebeck, Clifford)
October 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Answer)(Jennings, Sharon)
October 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, Defendants J Kenneth Blackwell, John Does 1-100.(Arnebeck, Clifford)
September 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant J Kenneth Blackwell. Responses due by 10/16/2006 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Corl, Christina)
September 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy, League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association of Withdrawal of Counsel & Co-Counsel; Substitution of Counsel; and Addition of Co-Counsel (Marshall, John)
September 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER re 6 Order directing County Board of Elections to preserve all ballots from the 2004 Election. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/11/2006. (cw, )
September 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing County Board of Elections to preserve all ballots from the 2004 Election and directing Defendant to serve forthwith a copy of this Order on each county's Board of Elections. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 9/7/2006. (cw, )
September 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM of Law regarding 2004 Ballots in the Possession of County Boards of Election by Defendant J Kenneth Blackwell. (James, Larry)
September 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Holliday James & Christina L. Corl by Defendant J Kenneth Blackwell (James, Larry) Modified on 9/6/2006 to add Christina Corl (kk1).
September 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Nicholas Coglianese & Damian Sikora by Defendant J Kenneth Blackwell (Coglianese, Richard) Modified on 9/6/2006 to add Damian Sikora (kk1).
September 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Declaration of Richard Hayes Phillips filed by Richard Hayes Phillips. Also submitted with this declaration was a CD of exibits in JPEG format. (srj, )
August 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Notice of CorrectionOrder docketed in the wrong case. (rew, )
August 31, 2006 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff will supplement his response to defendants reuest for production of documents by 9/06/06. Plaintiff will be deposed during the week of 9/11/06, at a time and date to be agreed upon by the parties. It is ordered that all discovery be completed by 10/15/06. Dispositive motions may be filed by 11/15/06. There will be no extensions of these dates. Signed by Judge Norah McCann King on 8/31/06. (rew )
August 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 252834 (srj, )
August 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT without Jury Demand filed by Plaintiffs League of Young Voters/Columbus, Willis Brown, Paul Gregory, Miles Curtiss, Matthew Segal, Harvey Wasserman, King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association, Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy against all Defendants J Kenneth Blackwell, John Does 1-100. (Filing fee $ 350.) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(srj, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2006 (srj, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association et al v. J. Kenneth Blackwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Lincoln Bronzeville Neighborhood Association
Represented By: Robert J Fitrakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Voter Rights Alliance for Democracy
Represented By: Robert J Fitrakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of Young Voters/Columbus
Represented By: Robert J Fitrakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Brown
Represented By: Robert J Fitrakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Gregory
Represented By: Robert J Fitrakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miles Curtiss
Represented By: Robert J Fitrakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Segal
Represented By: Robert J Fitrakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Wasserman
Represented By: Robert J Fitrakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer L. Brunner
Represented By: Damian W Sikora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio Republican Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert T. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew M. Damschroder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Bare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State Of Ohio
Represented By: Sharon A Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: The Ohio Election Justice Campaign
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Paddy Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Marlys Barbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Virginia Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Marian Lupo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Timothy Kettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Bruce Duncanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Peter Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Michael Connell
Represented By: James Allen Jones, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?