Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC et al v. Jay Ambe Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, BR IP Holder LLC and DB Real Estate Assets I LLC
Defendant: Jay Ambe Ltd., Duttguru Corporation, Amrutlal Patel, Bhogilal Patel and Darshan Shah
Case Number: 2:2007cv00388
Filed: May 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: John D Holschuh
Referring Judge: Norah McCann King
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2007. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2007 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, BR IP Holder LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC, DD IP Holder LLC (Elliott, Rex)
August 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER : The status conference scheduled for 8/31/07 has been rescheduled to 9/07/07 at 10:00 am, unless the dismissal entry is received prior to that time. Signed by Judge Norah McCann King on 8/30/07. (rew )
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER : A status conference will be held on 8/31/07 at 10:00 am unless the dismissal entry is received prior to that time. Signed by Judge Norah McCann King on 8/01/07. (rew )
July 31, 2007 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, BR IP Holder LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC, DD IP Holder LLC. (Elliott, Rex)
July 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file a Status Report by 7/31/2007. Signed by Judge Norah McCann King on 7/10/2007. (er )
May 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave for David E Worthen to Appear Pro Hac Vice obo Plaintiffs conditional of counsel's registration to ECF with this Court or seek leave from doing so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Norah McCann King on 5/11/04. (rew ) Modified text on 5/15/2007 (er ).
May 9, 2007 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiffs Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, BR IP Holder LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC, DD IP Holder LLC. Motions referred to Norah McCann King. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Elliott, Rex)
May 9, 2007 Filing fee for phv for David Worthen: $ 200, receipt number 200 256228. (er )
May 7, 2007 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiffs Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, BR IP Holder LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Defendant Darshan Shah Darshan Shah served on 5/4/2007, answer due 5/24/2007. (Elliott, Rex)
May 7, 2007 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiffs Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, BR IP Holder LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Defendant Bhogilal Patel Bhogilal Patel served on 5/4/2007, answer due 5/24/2007. (Elliott, Rex)
May 7, 2007 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiffs Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, BR IP Holder LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Defendant Jay Ambe Ltd. Jay Ambe Ltd. served on 5/4/2007, answer due 5/24/2007. (Elliott, Rex)
May 7, 2007 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiffs Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, BR IP Holder LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Defendant Duttguru Corporation Duttguru Corporation served on 5/4/2007, answer due 5/24/2007. (Elliott, Rex)
May 7, 2007 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiffs Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, BR IP Holder LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC, DD IP Holder LLC, Defendant Amrutlal Patel Amrutlal Patel served on 5/4/2007, answer due 5/24/2007. (Elliott, Rex)
May 3, 2007 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jay Ambe Ltd., Duttguru Corporation, Amrutlal Patel, Bhogilal Patel & Darshan Shah. (er )
May 3, 2007 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, BR IP Holder LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC & DD IP Holder LLC. (er )
May 3, 2007 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC, BR IP Holder LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I LLC, Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC & DD IP Holder LLC against Defendants Jay Ambe Ltd., Duttguru Corporation, Amrutlal Patel, Bhogilal Patel, Darshan Shah (Filing fee $ 350.). (er )
May 3, 2007 Filing 1 Civil cover sheet. (er )
May 3, 2007 Filing fee for cv case: $ 350, receipt number 200 256126. (er )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC et al v. Jay Ambe Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Restaurants LLC
Represented By: Rex H Elliott
Represented By: Charles Horne Cooper, Jr.
Represented By: David E Worthen
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DD IP Holder LLC
Represented By: Rex H Elliott
Represented By: Charles Horne Cooper, Jr.
Represented By: David E Worthen
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baskin-Robbins Franchised Shops LLC
Represented By: Rex H Elliott
Represented By: Charles Horne Cooper, Jr.
Represented By: David E Worthen
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BR IP Holder LLC
Represented By: Rex H Elliott
Represented By: Charles Horne Cooper, Jr.
Represented By: David E Worthen
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DB Real Estate Assets I LLC
Represented By: Rex H Elliott
Represented By: Charles Horne Cooper, Jr.
Represented By: David E Worthen
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Ambe Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duttguru Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amrutlal Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhogilal Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darshan Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?