Chubb Custom Insurance Company v. Grange Mutual Casualty Company et al

Plaintiff: Chubb Custom Insurance Company
Defendant: Grange Mutual Casualty Company, Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Grange Insurance Company of Michigan, Trustgard Isurance Company and Intergrity Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2007cv01285
Filed: December 20, 2007
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Referring Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2012 142 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER - Plaintiff is ORDERED to produce documents consistent with the foregoing to defendant by 5/18/12. Defendant will then have until 6/15/12 to file its opposition to plaintiff's renewed motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/11/12. (jr1)
April 17, 2012 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 137 Motion for Discovery. Plaintiff shall submit documents for in camera inspection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 4/17/2012. (nmk0)
December 20, 2011 134 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 126 Motion for procedural modification of order. Chubb is ORDERED to file a renewed motion for summary judgment by 12/30/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/20/11. (rew)
September 29, 2011 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying in part 68 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 69 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge George C Smith on 9/29/11. (lvw1)
March 25, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Grange's motion 48 in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 03/25/2010. (sr)
November 13, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Judge George C Smith on 11-13-09. (ga)
April 28, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The pretrial schedule # 24 is MODIFIED. Primary Expert due by 10/15/2009. Rebuttal Expert due by 11/15/2009. Discovery due by 12/17/2009. Dispositive motions due by 1/31/2010. This case will be available for final pretrial conference in April 2010, or as soon thereafter as the Court's calendar permits. Case referred to Settlement Week 12/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 04/28/2009. (sr)
January 30, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 16 - Defendants' Motion to Compel Complete Responses to First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Propounded Upon Plaintiff is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part in accordance with this Opinion and Order. Plaintiff must produce all discovery required by this Opinion and Order within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Norah McCann King on 01/20/2009. (sr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chubb Custom Insurance Company v. Grange Mutual Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chubb Custom Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy S Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grange Mutual Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grange Insurance Company of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustgard Isurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intergrity Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?