Citizens For Community Values, Inc v. Upper Arlington Public Library Board of Trustees Featured Case

Plaintiff: Citizens For Community Values, Inc
Defendant: Upper Arlington Public Library Board of Trustees
Case Number: 2:2008cv00223
Filed: March 7, 2008
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: FRANKLIN
Referring Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2010 42 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge George C Smith on 3/24/10. (lvw1)
November 12, 2008 41 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 21 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses Supplemental Declaration of David Langdon filed by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Langdon, David)
November 12, 2008 40 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 21 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses Supplemental Declaration of Timothy D. Chandler filed by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Chandler, Timothy)
November 12, 2008 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re 21 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses filed by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (Chandler, Timothy)
October 29, 2008 38 ABEYANCE NOTICE re 37 Bill of Costs (tto, )
October 29, 2008 37 BILL OF COSTS by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. (Chandler, Timothy)
October 24, 2008 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses filed by Defendant Upper Arlington Public Library Board of Trustees. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Angelique Paul Newcomb (Ex. 1), # 2 Affidavit Ann R. Moore (Ex. 2), # 3 Exhibit Estep v. Blackwell (Ex. 3), # 4 Exhibit Disabled Patriots v. Genesis Dreamplex (Ex. 4), # 5 Exhibit Disabled Patriots v. Cedar Fair (Ex. 5), # 6 Faith Center Verified Complaint (Ex. 6), # 7 Faith Center Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Ex. 7), # 8 Exhibit Deal v. Hamilton Cty. (Ex. 8), # 9 Exhibit Stahl v. Taft (Ex. 9), # 10 Exhibit Lee v. Javitch (Ex. 10), # 11 Exhibit Access 4 All v. Hi 57 Hotel (Ex. 11)) (Newcomb, Angelique)
October 16, 2008 35 FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by George C Smith on 10-16-08. (ga, )
October 7, 2008 34 Featured Case ORDER granting re 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 26 Brief. Responses due by 10/24/2008. Signed by Norah McCann King on 10/07/08. (rew )
October 7, 2008 Notice of Correction: Docket text of 33 corrected to read as follows - "Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses by Defendant Upper Arlington Public Library Board of Trustees" to correct document link from brief in support (#26) to the motion for attorney fees (#21). (kk2)
October 6, 2008 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses by Defendant Upper Arlington Public Library Board of Trustees. New date requested 10/24/2008. (Newcomb, Angelique) Modified on 10/7/2008 to correct document link to #21 (kk2).
September 26, 2008 32 AMENDED DOCUMENT to 27 Affidavit Errata - Declaration of Timothy D. Chandler in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys Fees and Non-Taxable Costs by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 9/29/2008 to clarify text (kk2).
September 26, 2008 31 STIPULATION in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees and Non-Taxable Costs re 27 Affidavit, 26 Brief, 29 Affidavit, 28 Affidavit, 30 Affidavit by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc & Defendant Upper Arlington Public Library Board of Trustees. (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 9/29/2008 to correct filers (kk2).
September 26, 2008 30 AFFIDAVIT re 26 Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses - David R. Langdon by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Langdon, David)
September 26, 2008 29 AFFIDAVIT re 26 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses - Kevin H. Theriot by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Theriot, Kevin)
September 26, 2008 28 AFFIDAVIT re 26 Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses - Michele L. Schmidt by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Chandler, Timothy)
September 26, 2008 27 AFFIDAVIT re 26 Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses - Timothy D. Chandler by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Chandler, Timothy)
September 26, 2008 26 BRIEF in Support of 21 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 9/29/2008 to clarify text (kk2).
September 17, 2008 Notice of Correction - Former docket # 23 (Objection - non motion) filed by Angelique Newcomb deleted & re-filed by Clerk as current docket # 25 (Response - non motion) to correct ECF filing event. (kk2)
September 17, 2008 Reset Deadlines as to 21 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses - Responses due by 10/10/2008; Replies due by 9/26/2008. (kk2)
September 16, 2008 25 Response re 20 PROPOSED Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction by Defendant Upper Arlington Public Library Board of Trustees. (kk2)
September 16, 2008 24 Featured Case ORDER granting # 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 21 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Defendant's response due by 10/10/2008. Plaintiff's brief in support of their motion is due 9/26/08. Signed by Norah McCann King on 9/16/08. (rew ) Modified on 9/17/2008 to add link to #21 (kk2).
September 16, 2008 23 Objection re 20 Brief Response to Plaintiff's Proposed Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction Order by Defendant Upper Arlington Public Library Board of Trustees. (Newcomb, Angelique) Modified on 9/17/2008 - doc deleted & re-filed as dkt #25 to correct filing event (kk2).
September 10, 2008 22 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefs re 21 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc & Defendant Upper Arlington Public Library Board of Trustees. (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 9/11/2008 to correct text & correct ECF event to motion (kk2).
August 29, 2008 Notice of Correction: Docket text of 20 corrected to read as follows - "PROPOSED Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc." (kk2)
August 28, 2008 21 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. (Chandler, Timothy)
August 28, 2008 20 PROPOSED Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 8/29/2008 to correct text (kk2).
August 14, 2008 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by George C Smith on 8-14-08. (ga, )
June 26, 2008 18 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 9/15/2008. Motions to Amend due by 9/15/2008. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 8/15/2008. Discovery due by 10/17/2008. Dispositive motions due by 11/17/2008. Final Pretrial Conference in 2/2009. This case will not be referred to a settlement week unless the parties request such a referral. Signed by Norah McCann King on 6/26/08. (rew )
June 12, 2008 17 RULE 26(f) REPORT of the Parties by Plaintiff Citizens for Community Values & Defendant Upper Arlington Public Library Board of Trustees. (Newcomb, Angelique) Modified on 6/13/2008 to correct filers (kk2).
May 23, 2008 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Chandler, Timothy)
May 13, 2008 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Upper Arlington Public Library Board of Trustees. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Ann R. Moore (Ex. 1), # 2 Affidavit Angelique Paul Newcomb (Ex. 2), # 3 Affidavit Jan Mell (Ex. 3), # 4 Affidavit Ruth McNeil (Ex. 4), # 5 Exhibit ACLU of Kentucky v. Grayson County (Ex. 5), # 6 Exhibit Byrne v. Terrill (Ex. 6)) (Newcomb, Angelique)
May 9, 2008 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2008 @ 03:00 PM in chambers before Norah McCann King. (jm1, )
May 8, 2008 13 ANSWER to 2 Complaint by Defendant Upper Arlington Public Library Board of Trustees. (Porter, Susan)
April 14, 2008 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. - Upper Arlington Public Library Board of Trustees waiver sent on 3/11/2008, answer due 5/12/2008. (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 4/15/2008 to clarify text (kk1).
April 9, 2008 11 Summons Issued as to Upper Arlington Public Library Board of Trustees. (kk1)
April 3, 2008 10 NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Telephone Conference set for 4/10/2008 @ 2:00 PM before George C Smith. Plaintiff is Ordered to contact Defendant's counsel in order to faciliate the phone conference. (lvw1, )
March 12, 2008 9 Featured Case ORDER granting # 6 Motion for leave to appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin H Theriot; granting # 7 Motion for leave to appear Pro Hac Vice of Timothy D Chandler; granting # 8 Motion for Leave to appear Pro Hac Vice of Heather Gebelin Hacker. Signed by Norah McCann King on 3/12/08. (rew ) Modified on 4/4/2008 to correct typo (kk2).
March 11, 2008 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Heather Gebelin Hacker (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 06480000000001596345) by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Langdon, David)
March 11, 2008 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Timothy D. Chandler (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 06480000000001596332) by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Langdon, David)
March 11, 2008 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin H. Theriot (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 06480000000001596311) by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Langdon, David)
March 11, 2008 5 BRIEF re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. (Langdon, David)
March 11, 2008 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. (Langdon, David)
March 7, 2008 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Citizens For Community Values, Inc. (rew )
March 7, 2008 2 COMPLAINT filed by Citizens For Community Values, Inc against Upper Arlington Public Library Board of Trustees. (rew )
March 7, 2008 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 002042. (rew )
March 7, 2008 1 Civil Cover Sheet. (rew )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens For Community Values, Inc v. Upper Arlington Public Library Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens For Community Values, Inc
Represented By: David R Langdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upper Arlington Public Library Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?