Szeinbach v. The Ohio State University
Plaintiff: Sheryl L. Szeinbach
Defendant: The Ohio State University
Case Number: 2:2008cv00822
Filed: August 27, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: John D. Holschuh
Presiding Judge: Terence P Kemp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 436 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part 358 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and 384 MOTION re 358 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Supplemental Motion For Attorney Fees Occurring After Docket 358. Plaintiff is awarded 938,560.53 in attorneys ' fees. Further, Plaintiff is awarded costs in the amount of $87,525.28. The Clerk is directed to enter a judgment in Plaintiff's favor in the amount of $1,026,085.81. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 6/30/2017. (kdp)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 407 OPINION AND ORDER - An Evidentiary Hearing re Plaintiff's attorney fee applications (Docs. 358 , 384 ) is set for 3/29/2017 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 1/12/2017. (agm)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER staying consideration of 358 Motion for Attorney Fees, and 384 Supplemental Motion For Attorney Fees Occurring After Docket 358 until the pending appeal is concluded. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 9/23/2015. (agm)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER: Defendant The Ohio State Universitys 07/22/2014 motion for a new trial or in the alternative, for a remittitur (doc. 359) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants motion for a new trial is DENIED. The jury verdict is REDUCED by $213,368.00 because plaintiff is not entitled to an award of back pay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/12/2014. (sr1)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 357 JUDGMENT in favor of Sheryl L. Szeinbach against The Ohio State University. Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 6/24/14. (sh1)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER: Plaintiffs objections to Balkrishnans testimony OVERRULED. Finding that the testimony is relevant, plaintiffs objections to the following testimony are OVERRULED. Plaintiffs objections to Balkrishnans testimony SUSTAINED. Finding that the tes timony is relevant, plaintiffs objections to the following testimony are SUSTAINED. Plaintiffs objections to Kostenbauders deposition: SUSTAINED. Finding that the testimony is irrelevant, plaintiffs objections to the following testimony are SUSTAINED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 06/02/2014. (sr1)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER denying 241 Motion for Discovery Conference, but ruling on the discovery issues based on the submissions of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/27/2014. (Abel, Mark)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER denying 213 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/13/2013. (Abel, Mark)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER denying 200 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 4/1/13. (sh1)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting 205 Motion; this matter is set for oral argument 3/8/13 @ 2:00 PM before Judge Abel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 2/25/13. (sh1)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting 201 Motion to suspend the briefing schedule for the Dft's renewed motion for summary judgment; Counsel to schedule a telephone conf w/in 5 days of a ruling on plf's motion for reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 1/15/13. (sh1)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER denying 192 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/19/12. (sh1)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER GRANTING re 163 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses filed by The Ohio State University. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/26/12. (sh1)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 188 STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: on September 20, 2012 Magistrate Judge Abel met w/ counsel to discuss the status of this case and case scheduling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 9/21/12. (sh1)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 182 OPINION AND ORDER: The Defendant's motion 122 for summary judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 12/10/2010. (er1)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Discovery Conference Order: Order in reference to discovery dispute conference held on 7/06/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 7/10/09. (rew )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Szeinbach v. The Ohio State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl L. Szeinbach
Represented By: Eric John Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?