Clark v. The Walt Disney Company et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Aaron Clark alleged that Defendants infringed on U.S. Patent No. 5,548,272 entitled "Talking Poster" by manufacturing, distributing and licensing the Hannah Montana Talking Poster and Cheetah Girls Talking Poster.

Plaintiff: Aaron Clark
Defendant: The Walt Disney Company, Jakks Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys, KB Toys, Amazon.com and Toys 'R Us
Case Number: 2:2008cv00982
Filed: October 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Patent Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Clerk's Memorandum as to 67 Bill of Costs. Bill of Costs 67 moot as Plaintiffs have paid the costs. (ddo1)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion re 68 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant To 35 U.S.C.§285 And 28 U.S.C§§1927 And 1961, 63 MOTION for Sanctions PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 11 filed by Defendant Jakks Pacific, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Grant Kinsel In Support of Reply) (Kinsel, Grant)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Aaron Clark, John Peirano re 69 Notice (Other) of Payment of Cost Rendering Moot Bill of Costs (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dickerson, Brian)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Reply re 67 Bill of Costs by Defendant Jakks Pacific, Inc.. (Kinsel, Grant)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re 68 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant To 35 U.S.C.§285 And 28 U.S.C§§1927 And 1961, 63 MOTION for Sanctions PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 11 filed by Plaintiffs Aaron Clark, John Peirano. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F) (Dickerson, Brian)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Objection re 67 Bill of Costs Memorandum In Opposition to Defendants JAKKS Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys, Toys R Us and Disney Shopping, Inc.'s Bill of Costs by Plaintiffs Aaron Clark, John Peirano. (Dickerson, Brian)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE to Counsel re 67 Bill of Costs: Memoranda Contra by Plaintiffs due 12/1/2009; Defendants Reply in Support due 12/14/2009. (ddo1)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant To 35 U.S.C.§285 And 28 U.S.C§§1927 And 1961 by Defendant Jakks Pacific, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration) (Kinsel, Grant)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 BILL OF COSTS by Defendant Jakks Pacific, Inc.. (Kinsel, Grant)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL ATTORNEYS' FEES BRIEFING by Plaintiffs Aaron Clark, John Peirano, Defendant Jakks Pacific, Inc.. (Kinsel, Grant)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 JUDGMENT in favor of the defendants pursuant to the 10/9/09 Memorandum Opinion & Order. Signed by Judge John D. Holschuh on 10/9/09. (sln)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER Granting 56 Dfts' Motion to Strike Ellen Shapiro's Declaration ; Granting 11 Dfts' Motion for Summary Judgment with Respect to the Patent Infringement Claim. Signed by Judge John D. Holschuh on 10/9/09. (sln1)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION for Sanctions PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 11 by Defendants Disney shopping Inc, Jakks Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys, Toys 'R Us. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order) (Kinsel, Grant)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Plaintiffs Aaron Clark, John Peirano. (Dickerson, Brian)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Discovery Conference Order: Order in reference to Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 9/21/09. (rew)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Edward Dickerson Plaintiffs Aaron Clark, John Peirano (Dickerson, Brian)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re 56 MOTION to Strike 54 Supplemental - Opposing,, DECLARATION OF ELLEN M. SHAPIRO filed by Plaintiffs Aaron Clark, John Peirano. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Dickerson, Brian)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery extended until 9/30/09. Plaintiffs voluntarily dismiss on all claims against TWDC due 9/30/09. TWDC shall have until 10/14/09 to file a renewed motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 9/10/09. (rew )
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 9/30/2009. by Plaintiff Aaron Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dickerson, Brian)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION to Strike 54 Supplemental - Opposing,, DECLARATION OF ELLEN M. SHAPIRO by Defendants Toys 'R Us, The Walt Disney Company, Jakks Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys, KB Toys. (Kinsel, Grant)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re 11 MOTION to Dismiss converted to Motion for Summary Judgment by the Court filed by Defendants Toys 'R Us, Disney shopping Inc, Jakks Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Song, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2) (Kinsel, Grant)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Supplemental Memorandum Opposing re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants JAKKS Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys and Toys "R" Us' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs John Peirano, Aaron Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Appendix A, # 3 Appendix B, # 4 Appendix C, # 5 Appendix D, # 6 Appendix E, # 7 Appendix F, # 8 Appendix G, # 9 Appendix H, # 10 Appendix I, # 11 Exhibit B, # 12 Exhibit C, # 13 Exhibit D, # 14 Exhibit E, # 15 Exhibit F, # 16 Exhibit G) (Dickerson, Brian)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER rendering Moot 46 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Necessary and Indispensable Party filed by dfts' Jakks Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys, and Toys R Us. Signed by Judge John D. Holschuh on 7/9/09. (sln )
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Denying 16 TWDC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge John D. Holschuh on 7/9/09. (sln)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint against all defendants, filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M) (Dickerson, Brian)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 47 Motion for Leave to File; a third amended complaint and denying 49 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 7/07/09. (rew )
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel: Telephone Conference held on 7/1/2009. (mra2, )
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 11 MOTION to Dismiss, 48 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief New date requested 9/3/2009. Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Additional Briefing in Response to Defendants' Pending Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Patent Infringement Claim by Plaintiff Aaron Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Proposed Order) (Dickerson, Brian)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 12 dfts' Motion to take judicial notice. Dfts' motion to dismiss 11 is Granted in part. Signed by Judge John D. Holschuh on 6/19/09. (Attachments: # 1 Exhs A & B) (sln )
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Aaron Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A to Third Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit B to Third Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit C to Third Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit D to Third Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit E to Third Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit F to Third Amended Complaint, # 8 Exhibit G to Third Amended Complaint, # 9 Exhibit H to Third Amended Complaint, # 10 Exhibit I to Third Amended Complaint, # 11 Exhibit J to Third Amended Complaint, # 12 Exhibit K to Third Amended Complaint, # 13 Exhibit L to Third Amended Complaint, # 14 Exhibit M to Third Amended Complaint) (Dickerson, Brian)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Necessary and Indispensable Party by Defendants Toys 'R Us, Jakks Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys. Responses due by 6/11/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Decl of M. Song, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Decl of M. Song, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Decl of M. Song, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Decl of M. Song, # 5 Text of Proposed Order) (Song, Michael)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against all defendants, filed by Aaron Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M) (Dickerson, Brian)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction # 45 amended complaint was deleted by the clerk the attorney for Plaintiff Aaron Clark will re filed the amended complaint. (rew )
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 43 Motion for Leave to File second amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/06/09. (rew )
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Aaron Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit M) (Dickerson, Brian)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Aaron Clark (Dickerson, Brian)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Discovery Conference Order: It is ORDERED that plaintiffs counsel go back and talk with their client about any documents in his possession or within his control that would help him remember when he first offered a Covered Product for sale and when he first sold one or which would assist counsel and the court with determining those dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 4/20/09. (rew )
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel: Discovery Hearing held on 4/16/2009. (mra2, )
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Motion for attorney Michale J Song to appear Pro Hac Vice of on behalf of defendants Toys 'R Us, The Walt Disney Company, Jakks Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys, KB Toys. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 4/16/09. (rew )
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael J Song by Defendants Toys 'R Us, The Walt Disney Company, Jakks Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys, KB Toys. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 7297) (rew )
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 18 Motion to Strike the declaration of Grant Kinsel Filed in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 4/15/09. (rew )
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Discovery Conference Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 4/14/09. (rew )
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lori V. Minassian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 4/8/09. (kch1)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel: Telephone Conference held on 3/19/2009. (mra2, )
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to appear Pro Hac Vice of Lori V. Minassian on behalf of Defendants Toys 'R Us, The Walt Disney Company, Jakks Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys, KB Toys. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 6654) (rew )
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant The Walt Disney Company. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David Thompson in Support, # 2 Exhibit A to Thompson Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Thompson Declaration) (Kinsel, Grant)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION to Strike 11 MOTION to Dismiss Declaration of Grant Kinsel Filed in Support of and Attached to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Take Judicial Notice filed by Plaintiff Aaron Clark. (Dickerson, Brian)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by Defendant Toys "R" Us, Inc. (Kinsel, Grant) Modified on 2/23/2009 to modify text. (kch1)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by Defendant Play Along Toys. (Kinsel, Grant) Modified on 2/23/2009 to modify text. (kch1)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by Defendamt JAKKS Pacific, Inc. (Kinsel, Grant) Modified on 2/23/2009 to modify text. (kch1)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Filing Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) by Plaintiff Aaron Clark. (Dickerson, Brian) Modified on 2/23/2009 to modify text. (kch1)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Toys 'R Us, The Walt Disney Company, Jakks Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys, KB Toys, Disney Interactive Media Group, Disney Online, BabyUniverse Inc, Etoys Direct Inc filed by Aaron Clark. (rew )
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to File first Amended Complaint and its exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 2/17/09. (rew )
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, Instanter by Plaintiff Aaron Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Amended Complaint, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G to Amended Complaint, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit H to Amended Complaint, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit I to Amended Complaint, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit J to Amended Complaint, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit K to Amended Complaint, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit L to Amended Complaint) (Dickerson, Brian)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Aaron Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit A-3, # 4 Exhibit A-4, # 5 Exhibit A-5, # 6 Exhibit A-6, # 7 Exhibit A-7, # 8 Exhibit A-8, # 9 Exhibit B-1, # 10 Exhibit B-2, # 11 Exhibit B-3, # 12 Exhibit B-4, # 13 Exhibit B-5, # 14 Exhibit B-6, # 15 Exhibit B-7, # 16 Exhibit B-8, # 17 Exhibit B-9, # 18 Exhibit B-10, # 19 Exhibit C, # 20 Exhibit D, # 21 Exhibit E) (Dickerson, Brian)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction: Former docket #22 (Response in Support) filed by Grant Kinsel, deleted and re-filed by Clerk and current docket # 24 (Reply to Response to Motion), to correct ECF filing event. (kch1)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Toys 'R Us, Jakks Pacific, Inc and Play Along Toys. (kch1)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Strike 11 MOTION to Dismiss Declaration of Grant Kinsel Filed in Support of and Attached to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Toys 'R Us, Jakks Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys. (Kinsel, Grant)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE in Support re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Toys 'R Us, Jakks Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys. (Kinsel, Grant)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Aaron Clark (Dickerson, Brian)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 2/19/2009. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 2/06/09. (rew )
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Mark R. Abel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/5/2009. (mra2, )
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jakks Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys and Toys "R" Us' Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Aaron Clark. (Dickerson, Brian)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Strike 11 MOTION to Dismiss Declaration of Grant Kinsel Filed in Support of and Attached to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Aaron Clark. Responses due by 1/30/2009 (Dickerson, Brian)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 26(f) REPORT of Parties by Plaintiff Aaron Clark. (Dickerson, Brian)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant The Walt Disney Company. Responses due by 2/17/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Reed Decl In Support of Mtn to Dismiss) (Kinsel, Grant)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2009 @ 10:30 AM before Mark R. Abel. Conf of the parties due 1/22/09; Rule 26f Report of the parties due 1/29/09. (sh1, )
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting # 13 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs memorandum contra due 1/30/09. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 1/09/09. (rew )
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/30/2009. To Respond to Defendants Jakks Pacific., Play Along Toys, and Toys 'R Us' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Aaron Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Dickerson, Brian)
January 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION re 11 MOTION to Dismiss REQUEST FOR JUDICAL NOTICE by Defendants Toys 'R Us, The Walt Disney Company, Jakks Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys, KB Toys. (Kinsel, Grant)
January 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Toys 'R Us, Jakks Pacific, Inc., and Play Along Toys. Responses due by 1/26/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Grant Kinsel, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5) (Kinsel, Grant) Modified on 1/21/2009 to correct filers. (kch1) THIS MOTION GRANTED WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS OF FALSE DESIGNATION OF ORIGIN AND DECEPTIVE TRADE PRACTICES. WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF PATENT INFRINGEMENT, THE COURT CONVERTS THIS MOTION INTO A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT. 6/19/09-SEE DOC #48.
January 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by Defendants Toys 'R Us, The Walt Disney Company, Jakks Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys, KB Toys SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY STAY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Kinsel, Grant)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Grant Kinsel. Signed by Mark R. Abel on 12/18/08. (kch1)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION to Continue Response Date by Defendants Toys 'R Us, The Walt Disney Company, Jakks Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys, KB Toys, Plaintiff Aaron Clark. (Dickerson, Brian)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Grant Kinsel for Defendants Toys 'R Us, The Walt Disney Company, Jakks Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys, KB Toys. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 5803) (kch1)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Plaintiff Aaron Clark of Dismissal without prejudice against Defendant Amazon.com (Dickerson, Brian)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to John D. Holschuh for all further proceedings. Signed by George C Smith on 10/20/08. (ss, )
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AO 120 form mailed to US Patent and Trademark Office. (kch1)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Edmund A Sargus recused. Case reassigned to George C Smith for all further proceedings. Signed by Edmund A Sargus on 10/20/08. (dh)
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing fee for new civil case: $ 350.00, receipt number 5056. (kch1)
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed by Aaron Clark. against Toys 'R Us, The Walt Disney Company, Jakks Pacific, Inc., Play Along Toys, KB Toys, Amazon.com. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K) (kch1)
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Civil cover sheet. (kch1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. The Walt Disney Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Clark
Represented By: Brian Edward Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Walt Disney Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jakks Pacific, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Play Along Toys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KB Toys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toys 'R Us
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?