Miller v. Countrywide Home Loans et al
Plaintiff: Dana J. Miller
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Quantum Appraisal Company Inc, Appraisers (Jane and John Doe unk), Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems and Carlisle, McNellie, Rini, Kramer and Ulrich Co LPA
Case Number: 2:2009cv00674
Filed: August 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: DELAWARE
Presiding Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 53 Defendant's Motion to Strike Petition to the Court for Criminal Investigation of Defendants. The Plaintiff's Petition to the Court for Criminal Investigation of Defendants 52 is stricken. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 07/14/2011. (dh1)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 JUDGMENT is entered pursuant to the Opinion and Order filed 09/30/2010. This case is closed. (dh)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying 48 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and Reconsider Emergency and Permanent Injunction, Restraining Order and Stay. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 08/24/2010. (dh)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Quantum Appraisal Company by Plaintiff Dana J. Miller. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 07/30/2010. (dh)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 45 Plaintiff's Motion for Emergency Injunction and Restraining Order for Stay of Judicial Foreclosure Sale. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 07/19/2010. (dh)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 35 Motion to Stay; 36 Motion to Compel is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 06/04/2010. (sr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Countrywide Home Loans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantum Appraisal Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appraisers (Jane and John Doe unk)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlisle, McNellie, Rini, Kramer and Ulrich Co LPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?