Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00864
Filed: September 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: HAMILTON
Presiding Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 1/31/14. (kn)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER denying without prejudice 101 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice 109 110 111 133 134 Defendant's Motions to Strike and denying without prejudice 147 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 3/14/13. (sem1)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER denying 107 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 3/12/13. (sem1)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER denying 105 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and granting 154 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 2/28/13. (sem1)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER in reference to telephone conference held on 2/06/12 re 88 MOTION to Compel Automated Call Distribution Evidence, 97 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's "Supplement to Expert Disclosures Regarding Call and Skill Login Data" of Richard F. Tonowski, Ph.D. are terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 2/06/12. (rew)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 3/30/11. (jcw1)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Opinion and Order denying 48 MOTION to Stay, 49 MOTION to Stay and 50 MOTION to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 3/15/11. (rew)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 OPINION AND ORDER granting 20 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery Requests. and DENYING 23 Response in Opposition to Motion. Chase is ORDERED to supplement its responses to plaintiffs Request for Document Nos. 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 12, 15, 17, 18, 20 and plaintiffs Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 5, 6 and 7, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Opinion and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/10/10. (rew)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Solvita A McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?