Alps South LLC v. The Ohio Willow Wood Company et al
Plaintiff: Alps South LLC
Defendant: The Ohio Williams Wood Company and Bruce Kania
Case Number: 2:2009cv01027
Filed: November 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: Pursuant to the telephone status conference held on 11/09/2011, the parties shall brief the Court on the issues outlined in this Order no later than 11/23/2011. Simultaneous response briefs shall be filed no later than 11/30/2011. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus and Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 11/09/2011. (dh1)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 43 The Ohio Willow Wood Company's Unopposed Motion to Redact or in the Alternative to Seal. It is ordered that the Clerk will remove the images of the previously filed Brief Against a Stay of this Consolidated Action, and in its place will file the version of the same brief that has been redacted to remove information sensitive to Alps. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 05/13/2011. (dh1)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER outlining the briefing schedule regarding the pending patent claims, which was established during the 04/19/2011 hearing before Judge Sargus. The Court shall hold a telephone status conference in this matter at 10:00 a.m. on May 20, 2011. The Court's Order entered on 03/29/11 consolidating Case No. 2:05-cv-1039 and Case No. 2:09-cv-1027 is AMENDED IN PART as follows: All future submissions by the parties shall be filed and entered in Case No. 2:09-cv-1027 only. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 04/19/2011. (dh1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alps South LLC v. The Ohio Willow Wood Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alps South LLC
Represented By: David W Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio Williams Wood Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Kania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?