Citizens in Charge et al v. Brunner et al
Plaintiff: Citizens in Charge, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, LetOhioVote.org, Thomas E Brinkman, Jr and Gene Pierce
Defendant: Jennifer Brunner, Ohio Elections Commission, Danielle R Blue, Yvette McGee Brown, Charles E Calvert, Brian Felmet, John R Mroczkowski, Harvey H Shapiro and Larry L Wolpert
Case Number: 2:2010cv00095
Filed: February 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: ADAMS
Presiding Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 JUDGMENT is entered pursuant to the Opinion and Order filed 08/19/2011. This consolidated case is dismissed. (Associated Cases: 2:08-cv-01014-EAS-EPD, 2:10-cv-00095-EAS -EPD) (dh1) (Entered: 08/19/2011) (dh1)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Agreed Order of Partial Dismissal dismissing without prejudice Counts Two and Four in Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 05/17/2011. (This case remains open, Case No. C2-08-1014 is terminated.) (dh1)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting PERMANENT INJUNCTION and ORDERS that Defendant Jennifer Brunner, in her official capacity as Ohio Secretary of State, is permanently enjoined from enforcing O.R.C. § 3517.12(B) to the extent it requires ballot committees to disclose any amounts payable to a circulator of its referendum petitions. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 02/25/2010. (dh)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Superseding Order Extending Temporary Restraining Order by fourteen (14) days until 03/08/2010 and vacating 15 the prior Order Extending Temporary Restraining Order filed 02/17/2010. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 02/17/2010. (dh)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION AND ORDER memorializing the reasons given in open court in support of 11 Order granting in part and denying in part Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 02/10/2010. (dh)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 02/08/2010. (dh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens in Charge et al v. Brunner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Brunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Elections Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle R Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvette McGee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Felmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R Mroczkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey H Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry L Wolpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens in Charge
Represented By: Bradley Michael Peppo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #1
Represented By: Bradley Michael Peppo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #2
Represented By: Bradley Michael Peppo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #3
Represented By: Bradley Michael Peppo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #4
Represented By: Bradley Michael Peppo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LetOhioVote.org
Represented By: Bradley Michael Peppo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E Brinkman, Jr
Represented By: Bradley Michael Peppo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Pierce
Represented By: Bradley Michael Peppo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?