Brown v. Parrish et al
Plaintiff: Frank C Brown, Jr.
Defendant: Russ Parrish, Deb Timmerman-Cooper, Stanley Taylor, John Doe Parks, John Doe McDonald, Brenda Cooper, Jondrea Parrish and Jane Doe V Workman
Case Number: 2:2010cv00352
Filed: April 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: MADISON
Presiding Judge: Gregory L Frost
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 JUDGMENT is entered pursuant to the Order filed 07/01/2014. This case is CLOSED. (dh1)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Deb Timmerman-Cooper be granted, that all other pending motions be denied, and that judgment be entered in favor of the defendants. Objections due w/in fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 5/14/2014. (kk2)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER adopting the Magistrate Judge's 02/07/13 Report and Recommendation. The motion for judgment on the pleadings 88 and Mr. Brown's motion for a preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order 90 are denied. Defendants shall file any motion for summary judgment within 60 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 03/12/2013. (dh1)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 88 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings & 90 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order both be denied. Objections due w/in fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 2/7/2013. (kk2)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 OPINION AND ORDER overruling Mr. Brown's objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation and ADOPTING AND AFFIRMING 66 the Report and Recommendation. The Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 38 is GRANTED as to all defen dants other than Defendant Timmerman-Cooper, and DENIED in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that the Motion for Extension of Time or Stay 41 is DENIED AS MOOT. The previously-ordered stay of this case is lifted, and the Magistrate Judge is directed to issue a new scheduling order. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 07/10/2012. (dh1)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 OPINION AND ORDER denying 38 Defendants' Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status and to compel payment of full filing fees. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 01/12/2012. (dh1)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: It is recommended that 38 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the Alternative to Revoke Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status and Compel Payment of Full Filing Fees be granted as to all d efendants except Warden Timmerman-Cooper and denied as to her. It is further ordered that 55 MOTION for Leave to Supplement Pleadings and/or Strike Therefrom S.D.Ohio CivR. 7.2(a)(2) & 62 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 56 MOTION for an Emergency Interim Hearing, Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order are denied. Objections to R&R due w/in fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 1/5/2012. (kk2)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER correcting docket numbers in Case No. 2:10-cv-967. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 05/04/2011. (dh1)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPINION AND ORDER denying 21 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 22 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 04/14/2011. (sr)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Screening Report and Recommendation that the complaint be DISMISSED for failure to state a claim re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Frank C Brown, Jr. Objections to R&R due by 6/11/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/25/10. (rew)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Parrish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank C Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russ Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Timmerman-Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jondrea Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe V Workman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?