Lane v. Wexford Health Sources (Contreator) et al
Plaintiff: William L. Lane
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources (Contreator), Vanessa Sawyer and Pamila Redden
Case Number: 2:2010cv00389
Filed: April 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Watson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 OPINION and ORDER adopting 81 the Report and Recommendation, denying 74 , 76 and 78 Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss; denying 83 Plaintiff's Motion for Writ of Mandamus. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 4/18/14. (jk1)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 74 , 76 & 78 MOTIONS to Dismiss be denied. Objections to due w/in fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 3/27/2014. (kk2)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION and ORDER granting 51 Defendant Vanessa Sawyer's Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting 64 the Report and Recommendation. This case is terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 8/12/11. (jk)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that the motion for summary judgment filed by defendant Vanessa Sawyer be granted. Objections to R&R due within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 5/18/2011. (er1)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 OPINION and ORDER adopting 39 the Report and Recommendation; denying 31 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO and a preliminary injunction; granting 21 Defendants Wexford Health Services, Inc. and Pamela Redden, M.D.'s Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 48 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; denying 49 Plaintiff's Motion for a subpoena of the records; denying 52 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/28/11. (jk1)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment & 31 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be granted and that defendants W exford Health Sources and Dr. Redden be dismissed from this case. The Magistrate Judge ALSO RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's Motion for a TRO and Preliminary Injunction be denied. Objections to R&R due within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 12/13/2010. (er1)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; denying 29 Motion for Pretrial Statement & denying 30 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 12/6/2010. (kk2)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION and ORDER - The Court OVERRULES 22 Defendant Vanessa Sawyer's Objection and ADOPTS 18 the Report and Recommendation in its entirety. Defendant Sawyer's Motion to Dismiss 12 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 11/12/10. (jk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. Wexford Health Sources (Contreator) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources (Contreator)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamila Redden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?